This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/09/2021 at 06:36:16 (UTC).

In Re: Adient PLC Securities L

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 In Re Adient PLC Securities L was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3846

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Julio Barreto, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Charles Eric Hyder, Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated

Defendant / Appellees

Adient PLC

Jeffrey M. Stafeil

R. Bruce McDonald

Plaintiff / Appellant

Bristol County Retirement System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey Thomas Scott Esq.

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Matthew J. Porpora Esq.

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Guillaume Buell Esq.

Attorney at Thornton Law Firm LLP

1 Lincoln Street

Boston, MA 02111

Craig S. Kesch Esq.

Attorney at Ganfer Shore Leeds & Zauderer LLP

360 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Shannon Hopkins Esq.

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

1111 Summer Street

Stamford, CT 06905

 

Court Documents

#51

#50

#45

#41

#38

#37

#35

#32

#30

#28

#27

#26

#23

#22

#21

#18

#16

#13

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Bristol County Retirement System Brief due date as 02/23/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 02/23/2021, FILED.[2999325] [20-3846] [Entered: 12/22/2020 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, informing Court of proposed due date 02/23/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 12/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2998874] [20-3846] [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to remove appeal from the expedited appeals, [ # 30 ] filed by Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, by JON, FILED. [2997917][45] [20-3846] [Entered: 12/21/2020 02:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 35 ], on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, FILED. Service date 12/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2994364][41] [20-3846] [Entered: 12/15/2020 06:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE[ # 38 ], on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, FILED.[2993430] [20-3846] [Entered: 12/14/2020 05:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ATTORNEY, Craig S. Kesch for Bristol County Retirement System, in case 20-3846 , [ # 38 ], ADDED.[2993429] [20-3846] [Entered: 12/14/2020 05:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, FILED. Service date 12/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2993332] [20-3846] [Entered: 12/14/2020 04:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance[34], on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, FILED.[2993226] [20-3846] [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 30 ], on behalf of Appellee Adient PLC, R. Bruce McDonald and Jeffrey M. Stafeil, FILED. Service date 12/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2992939] [20-3846] [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, FILED. Service date 12/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2992878] [20-3846] [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Adient PLC, R. Bruce McDonald and Jeffrey M. Stafeil, FILED. Service date 11/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2981522] [20-3846] [Entered: 11/24/2020 09:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, FILED. Service date 11/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2981482] [20-3846] [Entered: 11/24/2020 06:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, FILED. Service date 11/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2981481] [20-3846] [Entered: 11/24/2020 06:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, FILED. Service date 11/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2981480] [20-3846] [Entered: 11/24/2020 06:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CAPTION, Appellee name corrected, AMENDED.[2980827] [20-3846] [Entered: 11/24/2020 11:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2974406] [20-3846] [Entered: 11/13/2020 04:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, district court receipt # BNYSDC-22521380, FILED.[2974395] [20-3846] [Entered: 11/13/2020 04:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/14/2020, RECEIVED.[2974389] [20-3846] [Entered: 11/13/2020 04:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/02/2020, RECEIVED.[2974384] [20-3846] [Entered: 11/13/2020 04:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bristol County Retirement System, FILED. [2974371] [20-3846] [Entered: 11/13/2020 04:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less