This case was last updated from PACER on 03/16/2019 at 06:08:42 (UTC).

In-Depth Test LLC v. Vishay Intertechnology Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 In-Depth Test LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Vishay Intertechnology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1410

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

VISHAY INTERTECHNOLOGY INC.

SILICONIX INCORPORATED

Plaintiff / Appellant

IN-DEPTH TEST LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Thomas F. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 400

Redwood City, CA 94065-1434

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Corby Robert Vowell

Attorney at Friedman, Suder & Cooke

604 East 4Th Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Robert Greenspoon

Attorney at Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC

333 North Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60601

Dave R. Gunter

Attorney at Friedman, Suder & Cooke

604 East 4Th Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant In-Depth Test LLC, Certificate of Interest [ # 17 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[583234] [JAL] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:28 PM]

#17

(#17) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 02/04/2019 by email. [583226] [19-1410] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 18 ] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:19 PM]

#15

(#15) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Siliconix Incorporated and Vishay Intertechnology Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580991] [19-1410] [Thomas Fitzpatrick] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:15 PM]

#14

(#14) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Siliconix Incorporated and Vishay Intertechnology Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580990] [19-1410] [Thomas Fitzpatrick] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:13 PM]

#13

(#13) Entry of appearance for Thomas F. Fitzpatrick as principal counsel for Appellees Siliconix Incorporated and Vishay Intertechnology Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580987] [19-1410] [Thomas Fitzpatrick] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:09 PM]

#10

(#10) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant In-Depth Test LLC indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 01/24/2019 by email. [580398] [19-1410] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:30 AM]

#9

(#9) Corrected Entry of appearance for Jonathan T. Suder as of counsel for Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/24/2019 by email. [580397] [19-1410] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:29 AM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissionsof Appellant In-Depth Test LLC, Entry of Appearance - J. Suder; Transcript Purchase Order Form [ # 4 ] [ # 5 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 01/30/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[580290] [JAL] [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:59 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Dave R. Gunter as of counsel for Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580181] [19-1410] [Dave Gunter] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:44 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Corby R. Vowell as of counsel for Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580180] [19-1410] [Corby Vowell] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:41 PM]

#5

(#5) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant In-Depth Test LLC indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580179] [19-1410] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] --[Edited 01/23/2019 by CAB to revise docket text] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:40 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Jonathan T. Suder as principal counsel for Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580178] [19-1410] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:39 PM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580177] [19-1410] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:38 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Robert P. Greenspoon as principal counsel for Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579457] [19-1410] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 01/18/2019 05:19 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

#16

(#11) ORDER filed. Appeal Nos. 19-1409 and 19-1410 are consolidated. Each of the briefs shall include the full captions of the appeals as reflected in the order. Appellant In-Depth Test LLC's opening brief is due no later than 03/18/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [580483] [19-1409, 19-1410] [JAL] [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:02 AM]

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellant In-Depth Test LLC, Certificate of Interest [ # 17 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[583234] [JAL] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 02/04/2019 by email. [583226] [19-1410] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 18 ] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 13 ], certificate of interest Docket No. [ # 14 ], docketing statement Docket No. [ # 15 ], ERROR: The entry of appearance, certificate of interest, and docketing statement for Appellees were submitted in trailer case 19-1410. Filings must be submitted in lead appeal 19-1409 only. CORRECTION: Please ensure future filings are submitted only in lead appeal 19-1409. Any further submissions in 19-1410 will be non-compliant. Please note that compliant versions of these documents have not yet been filed in the lead appeal. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [581089] [JAL] [Entered: 01/25/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Siliconix Incorporated and Vishay Intertechnology Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580991] [19-1410] [Thomas Fitzpatrick] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees Siliconix Incorporated and Vishay Intertechnology Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580990] [19-1410] [Thomas Fitzpatrick] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Entry of appearance for Thomas F. Fitzpatrick as principal counsel for Appellees Siliconix Incorporated and Vishay Intertechnology Inc.. Service: 01/25/2019 by email. [580987] [19-1410] [Thomas Fitzpatrick] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • (#12) Note to file: The following cases are associated: 19-1409 Lead with 19-1410 Member Case. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [580485] [19-1409, 19-1410] [JAL] [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER filed. Appeal Nos. 19-1409 and 19-1410 are consolidated. Each of the briefs shall include the full captions of the appeals as reflected in the order. Appellant In-Depth Test LLC's opening brief is due no later than 03/18/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [580483] [19-1409, 19-1410] [JAL] [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant In-Depth Test LLC indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 01/24/2019 by email. [580398] [19-1410] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corrected Entry of appearance for Jonathan T. Suder as of counsel for Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/24/2019 by email. [580397] [19-1410] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 01/24/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissionsof Appellant In-Depth Test LLC, Entry of Appearance - J. Suder; Transcript Purchase Order Form [ # 4 ] [ # 5 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 01/30/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[580290] [JAL] [Entered: 01/23/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Dave R. Gunter as of counsel for Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580181] [19-1410] [Dave Gunter] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Corby R. Vowell as of counsel for Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580180] [19-1410] [Corby Vowell] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant In-Depth Test LLC indicating that a transcript is not needed for the appeal. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580179] [19-1410] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] --[Edited 01/23/2019 by CAB to revise docket text] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Jonathan T. Suder as principal counsel for Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580178] [19-1410] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/23/2019 by email. [580177] [19-1410] [Jonathan Suder] [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Robert P. Greenspoon as principal counsel for Appellant In-Depth Test LLC. Service: 01/18/2019 by email. [579457] [19-1410] [Robert Greenspoon] [Entered: 01/18/2019 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/14/2019. [578088] Entry of Appearance due 01/29/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/29/2019. Docketing Statement due 01/29/2019. Appellant's brief is due 03/18/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 01/15/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.