This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2020 at 06:02:06 (UTC).

Imad Jaffal v. Director Newark New Jersey Fie, et al

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Imad Jaffal filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Director Newark New Jersey Fie. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3148

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

ATTORNEY GENERAL UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

DIRECTOR UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

DIRECTOR NEWARK NEW JERSEY FIELD OFFICE IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

Plaintiff / Appellant

IMAD JAFFAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Enes Hajdarpasic Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Dhruman Y. Sampat Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

402 East State Street

Trenton, NJ 08608

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mikhail Usher Esq.

Attorney at Usher Law Group

2711 Harway Avenue

Brooklyn, NY 11214

Alexandra V. Tseitlin Esq.

345 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10001

 

Court Documents

17 #2

OPINION & ORDER

17 #1

Amended Notice of Appeal Filed

#15

(#15) ORDER (Clerk) As it appears that the District Court entered an order denying Plaintiff-Appellants motion for reconsideration on November 30, 2020, the foregoing motion to stay the briefing schedule is dismissed as moot. Accordingly, Appellants brief and appendix must be filed and served within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (LMR) [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:41 AM]

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Imad Jaffal to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3148] (AVT) [Entered: 11/18/2020 07:15 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: WIITHDRAWL APPEARANCE from Attorney Mikhail Usher, Esq. for Appellant Imad Jaffal. Certificate of Service dated 11/17/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3148]--[Edited 11/18/2020 by CLW] (MU) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:45 PM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexandra V. Tseitlin on behalf of Appellant(s) Imad JAFFAL. [20-3148] (AVT) [Entered: 11/16/2020 06:40 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dhruman Y. Sampat on behalf of Appellee(s) Director Newark NJ Field Office ICE, DIRECTOR UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. [20-3148] (DYS) [Entered: 11/11/2020 07:57 PM]

10 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

10 #1

Standing Order Excess Pagination

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Enes Hajdarpasic, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) DIRECTOR NEWARK NEW JERSEY FIELD OFFICE IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; DIRECTOR UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. [20-3148] (EH) [Entered: 11/09/2020 12:34 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Andrew Ruymann, Chief, Civil Division on behalf of Appellee(s) DIRECTOR NEWARK NEW JERSEY FIELD OFFICE IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; DIRECTOR UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. [20-3148] (JAR) [Entered: 11/09/2020 12:16 PM]

#7

(#7) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Enes Hajdarpasic, Esq. for Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General United States of America, Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Director Newark New Jersey Field Office Immigration & Customs Enforcement requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/20/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 11/06/2020 03:02 PM]

6 #3

OPINION

6 #2

ORDER

6 #1

Concise Summary of the Case

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from MIKHAIL USHER, ESQ on behalf of Appellant(s) IMAD JAFAL. [20-3148] (MU) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:13 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Imad Jaffal advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-3148] (MU) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:12 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Imad Jaffal. [20-3148] (MU) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:11 PM]

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Certified Copy of Amended Notice of Appeal filed 12/11/2020 received from Clerk of District Court. (LMR) [Entered: 12/14/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#16) Appellant Imad Jaffal verbally granted an extension of time to file brief & appendix until 01/28/2021. pursuant to Third Cir. LAR 31.4. (LMR) [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER (Clerk) As it appears that the District Court entered an order denying Plaintiff-Appellants motion for reconsideration on November 30, 2020, the foregoing motion to stay the briefing schedule is dismissed as moot. Accordingly, Appellants brief and appendix must be filed and served within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (LMR) [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Imad Jaffal to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3148] (AVT) [Entered: 11/18/2020 07:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: WIITHDRAWL APPEARANCE from Attorney Mikhail Usher, Esq. for Appellant Imad Jaffal. Certificate of Service dated 11/17/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3148]--[Edited 11/18/2020 by CLW] (MU) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexandra V. Tseitlin on behalf of Appellant(s) Imad JAFFAL. [20-3148] (AVT) [Entered: 11/16/2020 06:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Dhruman Y. Sampat on behalf of Appellee(s) Director Newark NJ Field Office ICE, DIRECTOR UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. [20-3148] (DYS) [Entered: 11/11/2020 07:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Imad Jaffal due on or before 12/21/2020. Appendix due on or before 12/21/2020. (CLW) [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Enes Hajdarpasic, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) DIRECTOR NEWARK NEW JERSEY FIELD OFFICE IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; DIRECTOR UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. [20-3148] (EH) [Entered: 11/09/2020 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Andrew Ruymann, Chief, Civil Division on behalf of Appellee(s) DIRECTOR NEWARK NEW JERSEY FIELD OFFICE IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; DIRECTOR UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT; THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. [20-3148] (JAR) [Entered: 11/09/2020 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Enes Hajdarpasic, Esq. for Secretary United States Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General United States of America, Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Director Newark New Jersey Field Office Immigration & Customs Enforcement requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/20/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 11/06/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Imad Jaffal. [20-3148] (MU) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from MIKHAIL USHER, ESQ on behalf of Appellant(s) IMAD JAFAL. [20-3148] (MU) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Imad Jaffal advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-3148] (MU) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Imad Jaffal. [20-3148] (MU) [Entered: 10/23/2020 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 10/22/2020 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Imad Jaffal in District Court No. 2-18-cv-05237. (CLW) [Entered: 10/22/2020 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIRECTOR NEWARK NEW JERSEY FIELD OFFICE IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mikhail Usher