This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2019 at 06:07:06 (UTC).

Illinois Tool Works, Inc. v. Rust-Oleum Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Illinois Tool Works, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Rust-Oleum Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20210

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS, INCORPORATED

Defendant / Appellant

RUST-OLEUM CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michele Rae Blythe

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth, L.L.P.

600 Travis

Houston, TX 77002

Ashly Iacullo Boesche

Attorney at Pattishall, McAuliffe, Newbury, Hilliard & Geraldson

200 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Philip A. Jones

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg, L.L.P.

1 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Other Attorneys

Victor Derrone Vital

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg, L.L.P.

2121 N. Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201-2469

Bradley Louis Cohn

Attorney at Pattishall, McAuliffe, Newbury, Hilliard & Geraldson

200 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Kristine Ann Bergman

Attorney at Pattishall, McAuliffe, Newbury, Hilliard & Geraldson

200 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Genevieve E. Charlton

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg, L.L.P.

1 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Rust-Oleum Corporation [19-20210] (CCR) [Entered: 04/04/2019 11:14 AM]

Open Document #1

Transcript Order Form - Fred Warner

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed (7/18/18 Jury Trial Afternoon Session, 7/19/18Jury Session Afternoon Session, 7/20/18 Jury Session Afternoon Session, 7/23/18 Jury Trial filed on 7/30/18) . Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20210] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 04/22/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Blythe, Boesche; email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Jones, Vital [19-20210] (Victor Derrone Vital ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:18 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20210] (Bradley Louis Cohn ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:21 PM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9032622-2] Parties updated: Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation, Appellee Cross-Appellant Illinois Tool Works, Incorporated in 19-20210. NOA filed by Appellee Illinois Tool Works, Incorporated. [9032622-1] [19-20210] (CBW) [Entered: 04/18/2019 11:45 AM]

Open Document #2

Transcript Order Form - Heather Alcaraz

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20210] (Victor Derrone Vital ) [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:54 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed (10/13/17 Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference filed on 4/16/19). [19-20210] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 04/22/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Blythe, Boesche; email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Jones, Vital [19-20210] (Victor Derrone Vital ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:02 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9042216-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20210] (CBW) [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:36 PM]

Open Document #4

Transcript Order Form - Mayra Malone #1

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed (7/13/18 Final Pretrial Conference , 7/16/18 Jury Trial Morning and Afternoon Sessions, 7/17/18 Jury Trial Afternoon Session filed on 7/30/18) [19-20210] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 04/22/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Blythe, Boesche; email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Jones, Vital [19-20210] (Victor Derrone Vital ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:17 AM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Heather Alcaraz. [19-20210] (Heather Alcaraz ) [Entered: 05/02/2019 06:25 PM]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/10/2019 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation. [19-20210] (RLL) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20210] (RLL) [Entered: 05/31/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:17-CV-2084. Electronic ROA due on 05/20/2019. [19-20210] (CAG) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • 5 TRANSCRIPT ORDERS received from Appellee Cross-Appellant Illinois Tool Works, Incorporated advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [19-20210] (CAG) [Entered: 05/03/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Heather Alcaraz. [19-20210] (Heather Alcaraz ) [Entered: 05/02/2019 06:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Illinois Tool Works, Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 05/02/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Bergman, Blythe, Boesche, Cohn; Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Charlton, Jones, Vital. [19-20210] (Kristine Ann Bergman ) [Entered: 05/02/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9042216-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20210] (CBW) [Entered: 05/01/2019 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Genevieve E. Adams for party(s) Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation, in case 19-20210 [19-20210] (AGL) [Entered: 04/24/2019 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Philip A. Jones for Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation in 19-20210 [19-20210] (CAG) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kristine Ann Bergman for party(s) Appellee Cross-Appellant Illinois Tool Works, Incorporated, in case 19-20210 [19-20210] (CAG) [Entered: 04/23/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20210] (Bradley Louis Cohn ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed (7/18/18 Jury Trial Afternoon Session, 7/19/18Jury Session Afternoon Session, 7/20/18 Jury Session Afternoon Session, 7/23/18 Jury Trial filed on 7/30/18) . Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20210] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 04/22/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Blythe, Boesche; email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Jones, Vital [19-20210] (Victor Derrone Vital ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed (7/13/18 Final Pretrial Conference , 7/16/18 Jury Trial Morning and Afternoon Sessions, 7/17/18 Jury Trial Afternoon Session filed on 7/30/18) [19-20210] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 04/22/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Blythe, Boesche; email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Jones, Vital [19-20210] (Victor Derrone Vital ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from appellant cross-appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed (5/3/18 and 5/14/18 Motion Hearings filed on 5/11/18) [19-20210] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 04/22/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Blythe, Boesche; email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Jones, Vital [19-20210] (Victor Derrone Vital ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed (10/13/17 Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference filed on 4/16/19). [19-20210] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 04/22/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: Blythe, Boesche; email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: Jones, Vital [19-20210] (Victor Derrone Vital ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Victor Derrone Vital for party(s) Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation, in case 19-20210 [19-20210] (ABT) [Entered: 04/18/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9032622-2] Parties updated: Appellant Cross-Appellee Rust-Oleum Corporation, Appellee Cross-Appellant Illinois Tool Works, Incorporated in 19-20210. NOA filed by Appellee Illinois Tool Works, Incorporated. [9032622-1] [19-20210] (CBW) [Entered: 04/18/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20210] (Victor Derrone Vital ) [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9024541-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/23/2019 for Appellant Rust-Oleum Corporation [19-20210] (CCR) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Rust-Oleum Corporation [19-20210] (CCR) [Entered: 04/04/2019 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.