This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/06/2020 at 06:12:14 (UTC).

Illinois Opportunity Project v. Steve Bullock, et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Illinois Opportunity Project filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Steve Bullock. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-35874

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellants

NATIONAL INSTITUTE ON MONEY IN POLITICS

COMMON CAUSE

CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER

Defendant / Appellees

MEGHAN HOLMLUND, in her official capacity as Chief of the State Procurement Bureau

STEVE BULLOCK, in his official capacity as Governor of Montana

Plaintiff / Appellant

ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Raphael J. C. Graybill

Attorney at Office of the Governor

1301 East 6Th Avenue

Helena, MT 59601

Christopher David Abbott

Attorney at State of Montana Department of Justice

1712 Ninth Avenue

Helena, MT 59601

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Robert Suhr

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

190 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Brian Kelsey

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

190 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Anita Yvonne Milanovich

Attorney at Milanovich Law, PLLC

100 E Broadway Street

Butte, MT 59701

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) Terminated Christopher David Abbott for Meghan Holmlund and Steve Bullock in 20-35874 [11901871] (QDL) [Entered: 11/20/2020 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Christopher David Abbott for Appellees Steve Bullock and Meghan Holmlund. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 11/20/2020. [11901857] [20-35874] (Abbott, Christopher) [Entered: 11/20/2020 04:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/14/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11858357]. [20-35874] (AD) [Entered: 10/14/2020 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Illinois Opportunity Project Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/14/2020. [11857710] [20-35874] (Suhr, Daniel) [Entered: 10/14/2020 09:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Illinois Opportunity Project Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/14/2020. Transcript ordered by 11/05/2020. Transcript due 12/04/2020. Appellant Illinois Opportunity Project opening brief due 01/12/2021. Appellees Steve Bullock and Meghan Holmlund answering brief due 02/12/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11850890] (RT) [Entered: 10/07/2020 12:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT is a litigant

Latest cases where Campaign Legal Center and Common Cause Maryland is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Robert Suhr