This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/15/2020 at 06:00:50 (UTC).

IDS Property Casualty Ins. Co. v. Government Employees Ins. Co.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 IDS Property Casualty Ins Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Government Employees Ins Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1407

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendants

PHILIP L. FELDBERG

CLAUDIA B. FELDBERG

JONATHAN SIMMS

K.F., a minor, by and through her mother

DAWN FANSANI-FELDBERG

WITHLACOOCHEE RIVER ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE, INC.

ALYNA PHROMSOPHA

DAWN FASANI-FELDBERG

Plaintiff / Appellees

IDS LIFE INSURANCE CO., d/b/a Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance

IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE CO., d/b/a Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance

Defendant / Appellant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas S. Guerrera

Attorney at Shaheen Guerrera & O'Leary LLC

820A Turnpike St.

North Andover, MA 01845-0000

Hugh C.M. Brady

Attorney at Smith & Brink, P.C.

350 Grainte St.

Braintree, MA 02184

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Jeffrey H. Katzenstein

Attorney at Halaby Law Group PC

14 Main St

Hingham, MA 02043

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Ronald E. Harding

Attorney at Harding Gurley LLP

65 Willliam St, Ste 207

Wellesley, MA 02481

Michael D. Schollard

Attorney at Harding Gurley LLP

65 Willliam St, Ste 207

Wellesley, MA 02481

Ronald Evan Harding

Attorney at Harding Gurley LLP

65 Willliam St, Ste 207

Wellesley, MA 02481

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. Brief and Appendix due July 9, 2020 for appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. [20-1407] (AL) [Entered: 06/03/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 05/28/2020. [20-1407] (REH) [Entered: 05/28/2020 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Hugh C.M. Brady for Jonathan Simms and Alyna Phromsopha; and Nicholas S. Guerrera for Philip L. Feldberg, Claudia B. Feldberg and Dawn Fasani-Feldberg. [20-1407] (AL) [Entered: 05/15/2020 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/09/2020 for appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1407] (AL) [Entered: 04/30/2020 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 05/14/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Hugh C.M. Brady for Jonathan Simms and Alyna Phromsopha. Nicholas S. Guerrera for Philip L. Feldberg, Claudia B. Feldberg and Dawn Fasani-Feldberg. [20-1407] (AL) [Entered: 04/30/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE of service for disclosure statement [ # 6335506-2 ] filed by Appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2020. [20-1407] (REH) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2020. [20-1407] (REH) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE of service for docketing statement [ # 6335504-2 ] filed by Appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2020. [20-1407] (REH) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2020. [20-1407] (REH) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6335502-2 ] filed by Appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2020. [20-1407] (REH) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Government Employees Insurance Company filed by Attorney Ronald E. Harding. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2020. [20-1407] (REH) [Entered: 04/30/2020 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #82) filed by Appellant Government Employees Insurance Company. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 04/30/2020. [20-1407] (KPC) [Entered: 04/16/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WITHLACOOCHEE RIVER ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where IDS Life Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases where IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant