This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/02/2019 at 06:05:20 (UTC).

Idorsia Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. v. Iancu

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Idorsia Pharmaceuticals, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Iancu. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2346

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office

Plaintiff / Appellant

IDORSIA PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Brian Racilla

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Kimere Jane Kimball

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314

Peter John Sawert

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Kakoli Caprihan

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Antigone Gabriella Peyton

Attorney at Protorae Law PLLC

1921 Gallows Road, Suite 950

Tysons, VA 22182

Thomas Hoxie Esq.

Attorney at Hoxie & Associates, LLP

76 Main Street, Suite 301

Millburn, NJ 07041

Cory S. Poker

Attorney at Hoxie & Associates LLC

75 Main Street

Milburn, NJ 07041

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #2

Certificate of Service

6 #1

Docketing Statement

5 #2

Certificate of Service

5 #1

Transcript Purchase Order Form

4 #2

Certificate of Service

4 #1

Certificate of Interest

3 #2

Certificate of Service

3 #1

Entry of Appearance

#2

Certificate of Service

2 #1

Entry of Appearance

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corrected Certificate of Service filed by Appellee Iancu to Doc No. [ # 13 ]. Service: 10/04/2019 by email. [640259] [19-2346] [Kimere Kimball] [Entered: 10/04/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Entry of appearance for Kimere Jane Kimball as of counsel for Appellee Iancu. Service: 10/03/2019 by email. [640169] [19-2346] [Kimere Kimball] [Entered: 10/03/2019 06:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Iancu. Service: 10/03/2019 by email. [639865] [19-2346] [Peter Sawert] [Entered: 10/03/2019 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER filed. Appellant's motion [ # 10 ] is denied as moot. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [638982] [MMA] [Entered: 09/30/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION of Appellant Idorsia Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. to withdraw counsel Antigone G. Peyton [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/24/2019 by email. [637822] [19-2346] [Antigone Peyton] [Entered: 09/24/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of appearance for Brian Racilla as of counsel for Appellee Iancu. Service: 09/17/2019 by email. [636123] [19-2346] [Brian Racilla] [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Kakoli Caprihan as of counsel for Appellee Iancu. Service: 09/17/2019 by email. [636122] [19-2346] [Kakoli Caprihan] [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Peter J. Sawert as principal counsel for Appellee Iancu. Service: 09/17/2019 by email. [636106] [19-2346] [Peter Sawert] [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Idorsia Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. Service: 09/16/2019 by email. [635876] [19-2346] [Thomas Hoxie] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Idorsia Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 09/16/2019 by email. [635875] [19-2346] [Thomas Hoxie] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Idorsia Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. Service: 09/16/2019 by email. [635873] [19-2346] [Thomas Hoxie] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Cory Poker as of counsel for Appellant Idorsia Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. Service: 09/16/2019 by email. [635872] [19-2346] [Thomas Hoxie] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Thomas Hoxie as principal counsel for Appellant Idorsia Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.. Service: 09/16/2019 by email. [635870] [19-2346] [Thomas Hoxie] [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 08/29/2019. [632695] Entry of Appearance due 09/17/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/17/2019. Docketing Statement due 10/03/2019. Appellant's brief is due 11/04/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antigone Gabriella Peyton