Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 06:19:12 (UTC).

Ideker Farms, Inc. v. US

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Ideker Farms, Inc filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1849

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees and Cross Appellants

IDEKER FARMS, INC.

VALERIE BINDER

CHARLES GARST, individually and, dba Garst Farms, Inc.

GAIL CUNNINGHAM, dba Cunningham Farms, Inc.

LYLE HODDE, dba Hodde & Sons Limited Partnership

RICHARD BINDER

RON SCHNEIDER

STEVE CUNNINGHAM, Trustee of the Doris J. Cunningham and Steven K. Cunningham Declaration of Trust

MARY SCHNEIDER, et al.

DAVID NEWLON, dba D Double N Farms, Inc.

BRAD TAYLOR, dba H.B.J. Farms, Inc.

ROBERT W. DREWES REVOCABLE TRUST

PATRICK NEWLON, dba Newlon Farms, Inc.

JASON TAYLOR

DUSTIN BINDER

CONNIE GARST, individually and, dba Garst Farms, Inc.

TYLER BINDER

APRIL BINDER

ELAINE BINDER

Defendant / Appellant

UNITED STATES

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Appellant Attorneys

Donald B. Verrilli Jr.

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Elaine Goldenberg

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Jonathan Meltzer

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Dahlia Mignouna

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Benjamin Joseph Horwich

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Seth Curtis Wright

Attorney at Polsinelli, PC

900 W 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Brent Allen

Attorney at Department of Justice

4 Constitution Square, 150 M Street Ne

Washington, DC 20001

Brian C. Toth

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION of Appellant US to extend the time to 08/13/2021 to file brief. Service: 06/02/2021 by email. [778214] [21-1849] [Brian Toth] [Entered: 06/02/2021 05:43 PM]

#10

(#10) Amended Entry of appearance for Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.; Elaine J. Goldenberg; Dahlia Mignouna; Jonathan S. Meltzer; Benjamin J. Horwich as counsel for Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider. Service: 05/18/2021 by email. [775587] [21-1849] [Donald Verrilli] [Entered: 05/18/2021 09:10 AM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant US. Service: 05/14/2021 by email. [775128] [21-1849] [Brian Toth] [Entered: 05/14/2021 02:38 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider. Service: 05/14/2021 by email. [775113] [21-1849] [Donald Verrilli] [Entered: 05/14/2021 01:52 PM]

#7

(#7) Corrected Entry of appearance for Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.; Elaine J. Goldenberg; Dahlia Mignouna as counsel for Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider. Service: 04/29/2021 by email. [771941] [21-1849] [Donald Verrilli] [Entered: 04/29/2021 09:12 AM]

#6

(#6) Entry of appearance for Brian C. Toth as counsel for Appellant US. Service: 04/28/2021 by email. [771790] [21-1849] [Brian Toth] [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:38 PM]

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider, Entry of Appearance [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/05/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [771778] [MMA] [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:23 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider Buffalo Hollow Farms, Inc.. Service: 04/26/2021 by email. [771040] [21-1849] [Donald Verrilli] [Entered: 04/26/2021 07:42 AM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.; Elaine J. Goldenberg; Dahlia Mignouna as counsel for Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider. Service: 04/23/2021 by email. [770987] [21-1849] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 5 ] [Donald Verrilli] [Entered: 04/23/2021 04:40 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 11 ], ERROR: Appellant's motion does not use the official caption for the appeal. CORRECTION: The official caption can be found on the docket report. Please ensure the official or short caption is used for future filings. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [779497] [MMA] [Entered: 06/10/2021 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 11 ] filed by Appellant US. The opening brief is due 08/13/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [779496] [MMA] [Entered: 06/10/2021 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION of Appellant US to extend the time to 08/13/2021 to file brief. Service: 06/02/2021 by email. [778214] [21-1849] [Brian Toth] [Entered: 06/02/2021 05:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Amended Entry of appearance for Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.; Elaine J. Goldenberg; Dahlia Mignouna; Jonathan S. Meltzer; Benjamin J. Horwich as counsel for Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider. Service: 05/18/2021 by email. [775587] [21-1849] [Donald Verrilli] [Entered: 05/18/2021 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant US. Service: 05/14/2021 by email. [775128] [21-1849] [Brian Toth] [Entered: 05/14/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider. Service: 05/14/2021 by email. [775113] [21-1849] [Donald Verrilli] [Entered: 05/14/2021 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corrected Entry of appearance for Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.; Elaine J. Goldenberg; Dahlia Mignouna as counsel for Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider. Service: 04/29/2021 by email. [771941] [21-1849] [Donald Verrilli] [Entered: 04/29/2021 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Brian C. Toth as counsel for Appellant US. Service: 04/28/2021 by email. [771790] [21-1849] [Brian Toth] [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider, Entry of Appearance [ # 3 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/05/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [771778] [MMA] [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider Buffalo Hollow Farms, Inc.. Service: 04/26/2021 by email. [771040] [21-1849] [Donald Verrilli] [Entered: 04/26/2021 07:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.; Elaine J. Goldenberg; Dahlia Mignouna as counsel for Cross-Appellants Ken Adkins, Robert Adkins, Jr., Robert Adkins, Sr., Estate of Betty Adkins, Estate of Robert Adkins, Sr., Ideker Farms, Inc. and Gerald Schneider. Service: 04/23/2021 by email. [770987] [21-1849] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 5 ] [Donald Verrilli] [Entered: 04/23/2021 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-1849 (Lead) with 21-1875 (Cross-Appeal). The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [770698] [21-1849, 21-1875] [MMA] [Entered: 04/22/2021 06:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/08/2021. [768571] Entry of Appearance due 04/28/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/28/2021. Docketing Statement due 05/14/2021. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 06/14/2021. [MMA] [Entered: 04/14/2021 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant