This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/25/2020 at 06:10:49 (UTC).

Ideal Innovations, Inc. v. US

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Ideal Innovations, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2065

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ROBERT KOCHER

THE RIGHT PROBLEM, LLC

IDEAL INNOVATIONS, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

GENERAL DYNAMICS LAND SYSTEMS, INC.

GENERAL DYNAMICS LAND SYSTEMS - FORCE PROTECTION, INC.

FORCE PROTECTION, INC.

OSHKOSH CORPORATION

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ahmed Jamal Davis

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1000 Maine Avenue Sw

Washington, DC 20024

Stephen Marshall

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

1000 Maine Avenue Sw

Washington, DC 20024

Jack Wilson

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C

1000 Maine Avenue Sw

Washington, DC 20024

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Holmes J. Hawkins III

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Britton F. Davis

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1515 Wynkoop Street

Denver, CO 80202

Salvatore P. Tamburo

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Megan R. Wood

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Gary Lee Hausken

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Lee Perla

Attorney at DOJ-Civ

Po Box 227

Washington, DC 20044

Alex Hanna

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Scott David Bolden

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 480, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

13 #1

Motion

13 #2

supporting document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket(#16) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [723061] [JAL] [Entered: 09/21/2020 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 13 ], ERROR: Appellants' motion did not contain the correct caption or a complete certificate of interest. CORRECTION: For future motions, pursuant to FCR 27(a)(1) and (3), please include the complete caption and certificate of interest. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [722397] [JAL] [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 13 ] filed by Appellants Ideal Innovations, Inc., Right Problem, LLC, and Robert Kocher. The opening brief is due 10/23/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [722391] [JAL] [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION of Appellants Robert Kocher, Ideal Innovations, Inc. and Right Problem, LLC to extend the time to 10/23/2020 to file brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 09/16/2020 by email. [722152] [20-2065] [Jack Wilson] [Entered: 09/16/2020 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Force Protection, Inc., General Dynamics Land Systems - Force Protection, Inc. and General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc.. Service: 08/26/2020 by email. [717746] [20-2065] [Holmes Hawkins] [Entered: 08/26/2020 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Oshkosh Corporation. Service: 08/26/2020 by email. [717712] [20-2065] [Salvatore Tamburo] [Entered: 08/26/2020 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellee US. Service: 08/26/2020 by email. [717707] [20-2065] [Alex Hanna] [Entered: 08/26/2020 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Force Protection, Inc., General Dynamics Land Systems - Force Protection, Inc. and General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc.. Service: 08/11/2020 by email. [714238] [20-2065] [Britton Davis] [Entered: 08/11/2020 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for Holmes J. Hawkins, III; Britton F. Davis as counsel for Appellees Force Protection, Inc., General Dynamics Land Systems - Force Protection, Inc. and General Dynamics Land Systems, Inc.. Service: 08/11/2020 by email. [714236] [20-2065] [Britton Davis] [Entered: 08/11/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Ideal Innovations, Inc., Robert Kocher and Right Problem, LLC. Service: 08/10/2020 by email. [713706] [20-2065] [Ahmed Davis] [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Ideal Innovations, Inc., Robert Kocher and Right Problem, LLC. Service: 08/10/2020 by email. [713704] [20-2065] [Ahmed Davis] [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Ahmed J. Davis (Principal Counsel); Stephen A. Marshall (Of Counsel); Jack R. Wilson, IV (Of Counsel) as counsel for Appellants Ideal Innovations, Inc., Robert Kocher and Right Problem, LLC. Service: 08/10/2020 by email. [713703] [20-2065] [Ahmed Davis] [Entered: 08/10/2020 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Oshkosh Corporation. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713429] [20-2065] [Salvatore Tamburo] [Entered: 08/07/2020 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Salvatore P. Tamburo; Megan R. Wood as counsel for Appellee Oshkosh Corporation. Service: 08/07/2020 by email. [713426] [20-2065] [Salvatore Tamburo] [Entered: 08/07/2020 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Alex Hanna (Principal Counsel); Scott D. Bolden (Of Counsel); Gary L. Hausken (Of Counsel); Lee Perla (Of Counsel) as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 08/06/2020 by email. [713170] [20-2065] [Alex Hanna] [Entered: 08/06/2020 05:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/22/2020. [710291] Entry of Appearance is due 08/10/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/10/2020. Docketing Statement is due 08/26/2020. Appellant's brief is due 09/25/2020. [JAL] [Entered: 07/27/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oshkosh Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan R. Wood