This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/22/2023 at 06:18:24 (UTC).

Idaho Conservation League v. Shannon Poe

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Idaho Conservation League filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Shannon Poe. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-35978

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

IDAHO CONSERVATION LEAGUE

Defendant / Appellant

SHANNON POE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Bryan Hurlbutt

Attorney at Advocates for the West

P.O. Box 1612

Boise, ID 83701

Laurence J. Lucas

Attorney at Advocates for the West

P.O. Box 1612

Boise, ID 83701

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Frank D. Garrison IV

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

3100 Clarendon Boulevard, Suite 1000

Arlington, VA 22201-5330

Damien Michael Schiff

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Shannon Poe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/28/2022. [12597223] [22-35978] (Garrison, Frank) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:49 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/19/2022, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12601021] (VS) [Entered: 12/02/2022 01:07 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12613404] (VS) [Entered: 12/19/2022 09:13 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12613404] (VS) [Entered: 12/19/2022 09:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 12/19/2022, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12601021] (VS) [Entered: 12/02/2022 01:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/28/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12597464]. [22-35978] (AD) [Entered: 11/28/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Shannon Poe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/28/2022. [12597223] [22-35978] (Garrison, Frank) [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Damien Michael Schiff for party(s) Appellant Shannon Poe, in case 22-35978. [12595056] (QDL) [Entered: 11/23/2022 12:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Damien M. Schiff (Pacific Legal Foundation, 555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290, Sacramento, California 95814) for Appellant Shannon Poe. Date of service: 11/23/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12595053] [22-35978] (Schiff, Damien) [Entered: 11/23/2022 12:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Shannon Poe Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/30/2022. Transcript ordered by 12/19/2022. Transcript due 01/17/2023. Appellant Shannon Poe opening brief due 02/27/2023. Appellee Idaho Conservation League answering brief due 03/29/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12595027] (JBS) [Entered: 11/23/2022 12:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Idaho Conservation League is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank D. Garrison IV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Damien Michael Schiff