This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/01/2022 at 08:02:15 (UTC).

IAC/InterActiveCorp, et al v. Adam Roston

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 IAC/InterActiveCorp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Adam Roston. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2501

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

IAC/INTERACTIVECORP

ASK MEDIA GROUP, INC.

BLUECREW, INC.

Defendant / Appellee

ADAM ROSTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Leonid Feller

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

191 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael Barry Carlinsky

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Charles G. Giger

Attorney at PARTRIDGE PARTNERS, P.C.

321 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654-5011

Scott Atkinson

160 Bovet Road

San Mateo, CA 94402

Steven L. Friedlander

Attorney at SV EMPLOYMENT LAW FIRM PC

160 Bovet Road

San Mateo, CA 94402

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Scott Atkinson by Appellee Adam Roston. [27] [7218292] [21-2501] (Atkinson, Scott) [Entered: 02/18/2022 01:24 PM]

#21

(#21) ORDER re: Defendant-Appellee Adam Roston's unopposed motion for Roston's counsel to present oral argument by video communications. The motion is GRANTED, and attorney Scott E. Atkinson may present oral argument by Zoom Video Communications. Counsel for the appellants will argue in person, in the absence of any separate request. The clerks office will contact counsel with further instructions. [ # 20 ] SCR [21] [7204166] [21-2501] (HTP) [Entered: 12/09/2021 08:37 AM]

20 #2

20 #1

Motion in reference to oral argument

#18

No Description Available

#17

RESTRICTED

16 #3

Special Note to Counsel Presenting Argum

16 #2

Current Covid-19 Courtroom Procedures

16 #1

Notice of Oral Argument

#14

No Description Available

#13

RESTRICTED

#11

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

#8

#7

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketAttorney Scott Atkinson for Adam Roston in 21-2501 terminated. [7218335-2] [7218335] [21-2501] (HTP) [Entered: 02/18/2022 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Scott Atkinson by Appellee Adam Roston. [27] [7218292] [21-2501] (Atkinson, Scott) [Entered: 02/18/2022 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#26) Case argued by Mr. Leonid Feller for Appellants IAC/InterActiveCorp, ASK Media Group, Inc. and BlueCrew, Inc. and Scott Atkinson for Appellee Adam Roston. [26] [7210314] [21-2501] (MLM) [Entered: 01/11/2022 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Docket(#25) Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Michael Y. Scudder, Circuit Judge and Thomas L. Kirsch II, Circuit Judge. [25] [7210313] [21-2501] (MLM) [Entered: 01/11/2022 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#24) Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney Scott Atkinson for Appellee Adam Roston. [24] [7208594] [21-2501] (CAH) [Entered: 01/04/2022 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Docket(#23) Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney Mr. Leonid Feller for Appellants IAC/InterActiveCorp, ASK Media Group, Inc. and BlueCrew, Inc.. [23] [7208408] [21-2501] (CAH) [Entered: 01/03/2022 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • Docket(#22) TEXT ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that counsel in this appeal shall present oral argument telephonically or by Zoom video communications. No attorneys will be present in the courtroom. The clerks office will contact counsel with further instructions. MOTIONS TO WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT: Counsel may, not later than 14 days before the argument date, file a motion under Circuit Rule 34(e) to waive oral argument if the appeal can be resolved based on the briefs and record and the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument. See FED. R. APP. P. 34(a). Counsel must first confer with opposing counsel before seeking a waiver of oral argument, and the motion must state whether the request is opposed or unopposed. Joint motions are preferred. [22] [7207722] [21-2501] (LJ) [Entered: 12/28/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER re: Defendant-Appellee Adam Roston's unopposed motion for Roston's counsel to present oral argument by video communications. The motion is GRANTED, and attorney Scott E. Atkinson may present oral argument by Zoom Video Communications. Counsel for the appellants will argue in person, in the absence of any separate request. The clerks office will contact counsel with further instructions. [ # 20 ] SCR [21] [7204166] [21-2501] (HTP) [Entered: 12/09/2021 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Motion filed by Appellee Adam Roston to present oral argument remotely. [20] [7203747] [21-2501] (Atkinson, Scott) [Entered: 12/07/2021 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#19) Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. [19] [7203404] [21-2501] (CAH) [Entered: 12/06/2021 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Submitted appellant brief by Leonid Feller and Michael B. Carlinsky for Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. [10] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7190677] [21-2501] (Feller, Leonid) [Entered: 10/07/2021 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael Carlinsky for Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. [9] [7190179] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2501] [9] [7190179] [21-2501]--[Edited 10/06/2021 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Carlinsky, Michael) [Entered: 10/05/2021 06:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Scott E. Atkinson for Appellee Adam Roston. [8] [7186116] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2501] -[Edited 09/16/2021 by ER - added Attorney Scott E. Atkinson] (Atkinson, Scott) [Entered: 09/16/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Steven Friedlander for Appellee Adam Roston. [7] [7185054] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2501] [Edited 09/13/2021 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Friedlander, Steven) [Entered: 09/10/2021 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. [6] [7182302] [21-2501] (Feller, Leonid) [Entered: 08/30/2021 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/07/2021 for ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. Appellee's brief due on or before 11/08/2021 for Adam Roston. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/29/2021 for Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp RJS [7181288] [21-2501] (AP) [Entered: 08/25/2021 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, September 7, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [4] [7181286] [21-2501] (AP) [Entered: 08/25/2021 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7180599] [21-2501] (Feller, Leonid) [Entered: 08/20/2021 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Leonid Feller for Appellants IAC/InterActiveCorp, BlueCrew, Inc. and ASK Media Group, Inc.. [2] [7180596] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2501] (Feller, Leonid) [Entered: 08/20/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp by 08/20/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 08/30/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/27/2021 for ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp [1] [7179507] [21-2501] (AP) [Entered: 08/17/2021 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASK Media Group, LLC f/k/a IAC Publishing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where IAC/Interactivecorp is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUECREW LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Gregory Giger