This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/29/2022 at 09:16:36 (UTC).

Hyatt v. Hirshfeld

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Hyatt filed an Other lawsuit against Hirshfeld. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2325

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

GILBERT P. HYATT

Defendant / Appellants

ANDREI IANCU, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, Director of the USPTO

ANDREW HIRSHFELD, Performing the Functions and Duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, Director of the USPTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew M. Grossman

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Washington Square

Washington, DC 20036

Mark W. DeLaquil

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Washington Square

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Molly R. Silfen

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Michael S. Forman

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Thomas W. Krause

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Farheena Yasmeen Rasheed

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#3

#2

#3

#4

#7

#36

#37

#40

#41

#42

#43

(#13) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [816556] [20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, 20-2325] [MVH] [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:30 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Mandate issued to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [816556] [20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, 20-2325] [MVH] [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JUDGMENT. AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED AND REMANDED IN PART. Terminated on the merits after oral argument. COSTS: No Costs. Mandate to issue in due course. For information regarding costs, petitions for rehearing, and petitions for writs of certiorari click # here . Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [804880] [20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, 20-2325] [MVH] [Entered: 10/12/2021 10:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) OPINION filed for the court by Moore, Chief Judge; Reyna, Circuit Judge and Hughes, Circuit Judge. Precedential Opinion. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [804879] [20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, 20-2325] [MVH] [Entered: 10/12/2021 10:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER filed granting Appellee Gilbert P. Hyatt's petition for panel rehearing [ # 801583-2 ] to the extent that the previous precedential opinion [ # 8 ] and judgment [ # 9 ] are withdrawn and replaced with the modified precedential opinion and judgment accompanying this order. By: Merits Panel (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [804875] [20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, 20-2325] [MVH] [Entered: 10/12/2021 10:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JUDGMENT. AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED AND REMANDED IN PART. Terminated on the merits after oral argument. COSTS: No Costs. Mandate to issue in due course. For information regarding costs, petitions for rehearing, and petitions for writs of certiorari click # here . Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [793568] [20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, 20-2325]. Vacated pursuant to the court's order. See Doc. No. [ # 10 ]. [MVH] [Entered: 08/18/2021 09:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) OPINION filed for the court by Moore, Chief Judge; Reyna, Circuit Judge and Hughes, Circuit Judge. Precedential Opinion. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [793565] [20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, 20-2325]. Vacated pursuant to the court's order. See Doc. No. [ # 10 ]. [MVH] [Entered: 08/18/2021 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Official caption revised to reflect Andrew Hirshfeld, Performing the Functions and Duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, as Defendant - Appellant. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [751004] [20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, 20-2325] [EKD] [Entered: 01/22/2021 12:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#6) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 20-2321 Lead with 20-2323, 20-2324, and 20-2325 Consolidated Member Cases. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [729168] [20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, 20-2325] [EKD] [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER consolidating appeals 20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, and 20-2325. Appellant's brief remains due on November 23, 2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [729167] [20-2321, 20-2323, 20-2324, 20-2325] [EKD] [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Molly R. Silfen; Thomas W. Krause; Farheena Y. Rasheed; Michael S. Forman as counsel for Appellant Andrei Iancu. Service: 10/08/2020 by email. [727699] [20-2325] [Molly Silfen] [Entered: 10/08/2020 03:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Gilbert P. Hyatt. Service: 10/08/2020 by email. [727688] [20-2325] [Andrew Grossman] [Entered: 10/08/2020 02:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Andrew M. Grossman; Mark W. DeLaquil as counsel for Appellee Gilbert P. Hyatt. Service: 10/08/2020 by email. [727684] [20-2325] [Andrew Grossman] [Entered: 10/08/2020 02:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/20/2020. [724336] Entry of Appearance is due on 10/08/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/08/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 10/26/2020. Appellant's brief is due on 11/23/2020. [EKD] [Entered: 09/24/2020 04:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREW HIRSHFELD, Performing the Functions and Duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office is a litigant

Latest cases where ANDREI IANCU, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office is a litigant