This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2021 at 10:32:45 (UTC).

Hyatt v. Hirshfeld

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 Hyatt filed an Other lawsuit against Hirshfeld. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1049

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Cross Appellant

GILBERT P. HYATT

Defendant / Appellants

ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office

ANDREI IANCU, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office

ANDREW HIRSHFELD, Performing the Functions and Duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Appellant Attorney

Andrew M. Grossman

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Washington Square

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Molly R. Silfen

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Joseph Matal

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Philip J. Warrick

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

Thomas W. Krause

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

 

Court Documents

#5

(#27) PARTIAL JUDGMENT. VACATED-IN-PART AND REMANDED. Terminated on the merits after oral argument. COSTS: No Costs. Mandate to issue in due course. For information regarding costs, petitions for rehearing, and petitions for writs of certiorari click # here . [777765] [18-2390, 18-2391, 18-2392, 19-1038, 19-1039, 19-1049, 19-1070]--[Edited 06/07/2021 by MJL to reflect that this is a partial judgment] [MVH] [Entered: 06/01/2021 09:40 AM]

#3

(#25) Official caption revised to reflect Andrew Hirshfeld, Performing the Functions and Duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, as appellant (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [751033] [18-2390, 18-2391, 18-2392, 19-1038, 19-1039, 19-1049, 19-1070] [JAL] [Entered: 01/22/2021 01:21 PM]

#22

(#22) Notice of Appointment of New Solicitor for the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 01/22/2019 by clerk. [579573] [17-2257, 17-2304, 17-2323, 17-2593, 17-2621, 18-1047, 18-1048, 18-1070, 18-1105, 18-1163, 18-1302, 18-1311, 18-1368, 18-1385, 18-1438, 18-1443, 18-1485, 18-1489, 18-1659, 18-1768, 18-1772, 18-1876, 18-1883, 18-1901, 18-1925, 18-1933, 18-1944, 18-1968, 18-2000, 18-2031, 18-2032, 18-2069, 18-2082, 18-2106, 18-2170, 18-2236, 18-2271, 18-2329, 19-1049, 19-1117, 19-1334] [MJL] [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:12 AM]

#21

(#21) RESPONSE of Cross-Appellant Gilbert P. Hyatt to the court order to show cause [ # 14 ] , court order to stay appeal [ # 14 ] , court order [ # 14 ]. Service: 12/26/2018 by email. [574418] [19-1049] [Andrew Grossman] [Entered: 12/26/2018 11:47 AM]

#19

(#19) RESPONSE of Appellant Iancu to the court order to show cause [ # 14 ] , court order to stay appeal [ # 14 ] , court order [ # 14 ]. Service: 12/17/2018 by email. [572050] [19-1049] [Molly Silfen] [Entered: 12/17/2018 08:50 AM]

#18

(#18) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant Gilbert P. Hyatt. Service: 12/13/2018 by email. [571677] [19-1049] [Andrew Grossman] [Entered: 12/13/2018 04:35 PM]

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#10

(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Iancu. Service: 11/08/2018 by email. [563486] [19-1049] [Molly Silfen] [Entered: 11/08/2018 10:16 AM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Philip Warrick as of counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 10/10/2018 by email. [556083] [19-1049] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 10/10/2018 02:39 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Thomas W. Krause as principal counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 10/10/2018 by email. [556070] [19-1049] [Thomas Krause] [Entered: 10/10/2018 02:24 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

#29

(#23) ORDER filed. The stay of the briefing schedule is lifted. The parties' joint motion [ # 561742-2 ] [ # 9 ] is granted to the extent that the appeals are consolidated, the principal brief of the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office is not to exceed 17,500 words; Gilbert P. Hyatt's principal and response brief is not to exceed 20,625 words; the Director's response and reply brief is not to exceed 17,500 words; and Mr. Hyatt's reply brief is not to exceed 8,750 words. The Director's principal brief is due within 30 days of the date of filing of this order. The due dates for the parties' remaining briefs should be calculated according to Federal Circuit Rule 31(a). The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The Director is expected to summarize his response as to why this court has jurisdiction over Appeal No. 2019-1049 in the jurisdictional statement in his principal brief. A copy of this order shall be transmitted to the merits panel assigned to these appeals.; - FOR CALENDAR . Service: 01/31/2019 by clerk. [582299] [18-2390, 19-1049] [LMS] [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:16 AM]

#24

No Description Available

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PARTIAL JUDGMENT. VACATED-IN-PART AND REMANDED. Terminated on the merits after oral argument. COSTS: No Costs. Mandate to issue in due course. For information regarding costs, petitions for rehearing, and petitions for writs of certiorari click # here . [777765] [18-2390, 18-2391, 18-2392, 19-1038, 19-1039, 19-1049, 19-1070]--[Edited 06/07/2021 by MJL to reflect that this is a partial judgment] [MVH] [Entered: 06/01/2021 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) OPINION filed for the court by Reyna, Circuit Judge; Wallach, Circuit Judge and Hughes, Circuit Judge. Precedential Opinion. [777764] [18-2390, 18-2391, 18-2392, 19-1038, 19-1039, 19-1049, 19-1070] [MVH] [Entered: 06/01/2021 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Official caption revised to reflect Andrew Hirshfeld, Performing the Functions and Duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, as appellant (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [751033] [18-2390, 18-2391, 18-2392, 19-1038, 19-1039, 19-1049, 19-1070] [JAL] [Entered: 01/22/2021 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docket(#24) Note to file: The following cases are associated:18-2390 (lead) with 19-1049 (consolidated). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [582415] [18-2390, 19-1049] [SJ] [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER filed. The stay of the briefing schedule is lifted. The parties' joint motion [ # 561742-2 ] [ # 9 ] is granted to the extent that the appeals are consolidated, the principal brief of the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office is not to exceed 17,500 words; Gilbert P. Hyatt's principal and response brief is not to exceed 20,625 words; the Director's response and reply brief is not to exceed 17,500 words; and Mr. Hyatt's reply brief is not to exceed 8,750 words. The Director's principal brief is due within 30 days of the date of filing of this order. The due dates for the parties' remaining briefs should be calculated according to Federal Circuit Rule 31(a). The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The Director is expected to summarize his response as to why this court has jurisdiction over Appeal No. 2019-1049 in the jurisdictional statement in his principal brief. A copy of this order shall be transmitted to the merits panel assigned to these appeals.; - FOR CALENDAR . Service: 01/31/2019 by clerk. [582299] [18-2390, 19-1049] [LMS] [Entered: 01/31/2019 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Appointment of New Solicitor for the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 01/22/2019 by clerk. [579573] [17-2257, 17-2304, 17-2323, 17-2593, 17-2621, 18-1047, 18-1048, 18-1070, 18-1105, 18-1163, 18-1302, 18-1311, 18-1368, 18-1385, 18-1438, 18-1443, 18-1485, 18-1489, 18-1659, 18-1768, 18-1772, 18-1876, 18-1883, 18-1901, 18-1925, 18-1933, 18-1944, 18-1968, 18-2000, 18-2031, 18-2032, 18-2069, 18-2082, 18-2106, 18-2170, 18-2236, 18-2271, 18-2329, 19-1049, 19-1117, 19-1334] [MJL] [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE of Cross-Appellant Gilbert P. Hyatt to the court order to show cause [ # 14 ] , court order to stay appeal [ # 14 ] , court order [ # 14 ]. Service: 12/26/2018 by email. [574418] [19-1049] [Andrew Grossman] [Entered: 12/26/2018 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: ERROR: Appellant's response [ # 19 ] was not fully text-searchable. CORRECTION: Pursuant to the court's Electronic Filing Procedures (established under FCR 25(c)(4) and 25(d)), documents must be text-searchable. Please ensure future filings are entirely text-searchable. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [572071] [MJL] [Entered: 12/17/2018 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE of Appellant Iancu to the court order to show cause [ # 14 ] , court order to stay appeal [ # 14 ] , court order [ # 14 ]. Service: 12/17/2018 by email. [572050] [19-1049] [Molly Silfen] [Entered: 12/17/2018 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Cross-Appellant Gilbert P. Hyatt. Service: 12/13/2018 by email. [571677] [19-1049] [Andrew Grossman] [Entered: 12/13/2018 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Iancu. Service: 11/08/2018 by email. [563486] [19-1049] [Molly Silfen] [Entered: 11/08/2018 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORRECTED ENTRY: MOTION of Cross-Appellant Gilbert P. Hyatt and Appellant Iancu to consolidate appeals (18-2390), waive requirement regarding the briefs (extend word limits) [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 10/31/2018 by email. [561744]--[Edited 10/31/2018 by SMJ - Reason: to correct relief] [Molly Silfen] [Entered: 10/31/2018 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Docket(#8) Note to file: 19-1049 (COMP COMPANION started 10/17/2018) with 18-2390. These cases shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel for oral argument. [558184] [18-2390, 19-1049] [JAL] [Entered: 10/17/2018 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Docket(#7) Official caption revised to reflect cross-appeal. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [556504] [MJL] [Entered: 10/11/2018 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Docket(#6) Note to file: The following cases are consolidated: 19-1049 (Lead) with 19-1070 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [556503] [19-1049, 19-1070] [MJL] [Entered: 10/11/2018 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Philip Warrick as of counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 10/10/2018 by email. [556083] [19-1049] [Philip Warrick] [Entered: 10/10/2018 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Molly R. Silfen as of counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 10/10/2018 by email. [556080] [19-1049] [Molly Silfen] [Entered: 10/10/2018 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Joseph Matal as of counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 10/10/2018 by email. [556079] [19-1049] [Joseph Matal] [Entered: 10/10/2018 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Thomas W. Krause as principal counsel for Appellant Iancu. Service: 10/10/2018 by email. [556070] [19-1049] [Thomas Krause] [Entered: 10/10/2018 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 10/01/2018. [555542] Entry of Appearance due 10/23/2018. Certificate of Interest due 10/23/2018. Docketing Statement due 11/08/2018. Appellant's brief due 12/10/2018. [MJL] [Entered: 10/09/2018 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip J. Warrick