This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/11/2019 at 06:00:56 (UTC).

Hunter v. EPA, et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Hunter filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against EPA,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5055

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

STATE CHAMBER OF OKLAHOMA

TULSA REGIONAL CHAMBER

NATIONAL FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT BUSINESS

PORTLAND CEMENT ASSOCIATION

STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL MIKE HUNTER, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Oklahoma

Defendant / Appellees

RICKEY JAMES, in his official capacity as Assistant Secretary of the Army for Civil Works

ANDREW WHEELER, in his official capacity as Acting Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency

UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY

UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS

Consolidated Defendants

L.E.A.D. AGENCY, INC.

WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John Michael Connolly

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy

1600 Wilson Blvd, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22209

William Consovoy

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy

1600 Wilson Blvd, Suite 700

Arlington, VA 22209

Mithun Mansinghani

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma

313 Ne 21St Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Consolidated Defendant Attorney

Kelly Hunter Foster

Attorney at Waterkeeper Alliance

P.O. Box 4483

Tulsa, OK 74159

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Appendix Vol. 2

Open Document #1

Appendix Vol 1

Open Document #2

Errata sheet

Open Document #1

Appellants' Brief

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • Docket[10669405] Minute order filed - Appellees' brief now due 09/09/2019 for Rickey James, L.E.A.D. Agency, Inc., United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Waterkeeper Alliance and Andrew Wheeler. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-5055] [Entered: 08/08/2019 02:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10669390] Errata sheet filed by Mr. Mike Hunter, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business, Tulsa Regional Chamber, Portland Cement Association, and State Chamber of Oklahoma to Principal Brief for Plaintiffs-Appellants. Served on 08/08/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5055] MM [Entered: 08/08/2019 02:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10669310] Notice of appellants' deficient brief received from Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Mr. Mike Hunter, National Federation of Independent Business, Portland Cement Association, State Chamber of Oklahoma and Tulsa Regional Chamber. See attached letter for specifics. Appellants' brief due on 08/19/2019 for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business, Portland Cement Association, State Chamber of Oklahoma and Tulsa Regional Chamber. [19-5055] [Entered: 08/08/2019 12:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10668848] Appellant's appendix filed by Mr. Mike Hunter Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business, Tulsa Regional Chamber, Portland Cement Association, and State Chamber of Oklahoma. Total number of volumes filed: 2. Served on 08/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5055]--[Edited 08/09/2019 by KLP to add the other filers.] MM [Entered: 08/06/2019 05:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10668847] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Mr. Mike Hunter, U.S. Chamber of Commerce, National Federation of Independent Business,Tulsa Regional Chamber, Portland Cement Association, and State Chamber of Oklahoma. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 08/06/2019 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5055]--[Edited 08/08/2019 by KLP to attach an errata sheet.] MM [Entered: 08/06/2019 05:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10658796] Entry of appearance filed by Janette Kay Brimmer and Jennifer Cristie Chavez for Waterkeeper Alliance and L.E.A.D. Agency, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5055] [Entered: 06/27/2019 02:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docket[10658702] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer C. Chavez and Janette K. Brimmer for Appellees L.E.A.D. Agency, Inc. and Waterkeeper Alliance for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5055]--[Edited 06/27/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 6/27/19.] JCC [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10658617] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/27/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 08/06/2019 for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Mike Hunter, National Federation of Independent Business, Portland Cement Association, State Chamber of Oklahoma and Tulsa Regional Chamber. [19-5055] [Entered: 06/27/2019 08:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10658484] Entry of appearance filed by John Michael Connolly and William Consovoy for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business, State Chamber of Oklahoma, Tulsa Regional Chamber and Portland Cement Association. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/26/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5055] [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Docket[10658451] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 07/03/2019 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-5055] [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10658442] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Mike Hunter. Served on 06/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5055] MM [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10658435] Entry of appearance filed by Mithun Mansinghani for (State of Oklahoma ex rel.) Mike Hunter. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5055] [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Docket[10658379] Entry of appearance submitted by Mithun Mansinghani for Appellant Mr. Mike Hunter for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5055] --[Edited 06/26/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] MM [Entered: 06/26/2019 12:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10658290] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert Lundman for Andrew Wheeler, EPA, United States Army Corps of Engineers and Rickey James. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5055] [Entered: 06/26/2019 10:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Docket[10658275] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert J. Lundman for Appellees EPA, Rickey James, United States Army Corps of Engineers and Andrew Wheeler for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/26/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-5055]--[Edited 06/26/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 6/26/19.] RL [Entered: 06/26/2019 09:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10658175] Entry of appearance filed by Kelly Hunter Foster for Waterkeeper Alliance. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (all known parties have been previously disclosed). Served on 06/25/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5055] [Entered: 06/25/2019 03:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Docket[10658170] Entry of appearance submitted by Kelly Hunter Foster for Appellee Waterkeeper Alliance for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/25/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 6/25/19][19-5055] KH [Entered: 06/25/2019 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10657905] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David Phillip Page for L.E.A.D Agency, Inc. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/24/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5055] [Entered: 06/24/2019 04:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Docket[10657822] Entry of appearance submitted by David P. Page for L.E.A.D. Agency, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/24/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5055]--[Edited 06/24/2019 by JM to remove PDF filed by the court on 6/24/19.] DPP [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10655298] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/12/2019 Docketing statement due 06/26/2019 for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Mike Hunter, National Federation of Independent Business, Portland Cement Association, State Chamber of Oklahoma and Tulsa Regional Chamber. Transcript order form due 06/26/2019 for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Mike Hunter, National Federation of Independent Business, Portland Cement Association, State Chamber of Oklahoma and Tulsa Regional Chamber. Notice of appearance due on 06/26/2019 for Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Mike Hunter, Rickey James, National Federation of Independent Business, Portland Cement Association, State Chamber of Oklahoma, Tulsa Regional Chamber, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler. [19-5055] [Entered: 06/12/2019 11:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL FEDERATION OF INDEPENDENT BUSINESS is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant