Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2021 at 06:18:20 (UTC).

Huguette Young v. Kwame Raoul

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Huguette Young filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Kwame Raoul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1109

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

KWAME RAOUL

Plaintiff / Appellant

HUGUETTE NICOLE YOUNG

Junction City, OR 97448

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Huguette Nicole Young

24989 Lawrence Road

Junction City, OR 97448

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [13] [7144817] [21-1109] (AD) [Entered: 03/02/2021 12:52 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER: Appellant Huguette Nicole Young is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Huguette Nicole Young by 02/19/2021. [12] [7139713] [21-1109] (AD) [Entered: 02/05/2021 08:55 AM]

#11

(#11) ORDER re: Motion to proceed to file fee waiver request, filed on 2/1/2021. A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is currently pending before the district court. Accordingly, the appellants motion will be filed without court action. If the district court denies the pending motion, the appellant may renew her request with this court, using the proper asset affidavit form. A further review of the docket indicates that on February 1, 2021, the clerk received the appellants brief and accepted it for filing. CMD [11] [7139420] [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:38 PM]

9 #2

mf ifp

9 #1

Order to Transfer IFP Motion

#8

(#8) Order issued DENYING motion to become an electronic filer. Appellant has already submitted her brief, and no appellees are currently participating in this appeal, so she will not be required to file many additional documents. Appellant is warned that unnecessary or frivolous filings may result in sanctions. [ # 3 ] JPK [8] [7138640] [21-1109] Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0140 0000 6080 1245. [8] [7138640] [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:53 PM]

#7

(#7) 1 copy Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young. Electronically Transmitted. [7] [7138368] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 02/01/2021 09:01 AM]

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young to proceed to file fee waiver request and opening brief beyond missed deadlines. [5] [7138364] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 02/01/2021 08:53 AM]

#4

(#4) Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young. [4] [7138029] [21-1109]--[Edited 01/29/2021 by AD to reflect proper document filed.] (CAH) [Entered: 01/29/2021 08:48 AM]

#3

(#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young to become an electronic filer. [3] [7137743] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 01/28/2021 10:49 AM]

#2

(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7135868] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:23 AM]

1 #4

Notice to District Court

1 #3

Fee Notice

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [13] [7144817] [21-1109] (AD) [Entered: 03/02/2021 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Appellant Huguette Nicole Young is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Huguette Nicole Young by 02/19/2021. [12] [7139713] [21-1109] (AD) [Entered: 02/05/2021 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re: Motion to proceed to file fee waiver request, filed on 2/1/2021. A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is currently pending before the district court. Accordingly, the appellants motion will be filed without court action. If the district court denies the pending motion, the appellant may renew her request with this court, using the proper asset affidavit form. A further review of the docket indicates that on February 1, 2021, the clerk received the appellants brief and accepted it for filing. CMD [11] [7139420] [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docket(#10) Notification from the District Court that a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is pending. [10] [7139219] [21-1109] (MM) [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order issued TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [9] [7139061] [21-1109] (CG) [Entered: 02/02/2021 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order issued DENYING motion to become an electronic filer. Appellant has already submitted her brief, and no appellees are currently participating in this appeal, so she will not be required to file many additional documents. Appellant is warned that unnecessary or frivolous filings may result in sanctions. [ # 3 ] JPK [8] [7138640] [21-1109] Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0140 0000 6080 1245. [8] [7138640] [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 1 copy Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young. Electronically Transmitted. [7] [7138368] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 02/01/2021 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Prose motion filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [6] [7138365] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 02/01/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young to proceed to file fee waiver request and opening brief beyond missed deadlines. [5] [7138364] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 02/01/2021 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young. [4] [7138029] [21-1109]--[Edited 01/29/2021 by AD to reflect proper document filed.] (CAH) [Entered: 01/29/2021 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Huguette Nicole Young to become an electronic filer. [3] [7137743] [21-1109] (CAH) [Entered: 01/28/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7135868] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 02/03/2021. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Huguette Nicole Young by 01/27/2021. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/03/2021 for Appellant Huguette Nicole Young [1] [7135844] [21-1109] (FP) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Huguette Nicole Young