This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 06:52:12 (UTC).

Hughes v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Hughes filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-38

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Leslie Hughes

Jonesville, VA 24263

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Leslie Hughes

Attorney at United States Penitentary

P.O. Box 305

Jonesville, VA 24263

Respondent Attorney

Steven David Clymer

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

100 South Clinton Street

Syracuse, NY 13261

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Case FILED

#16

(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to extend time to file documents, [15], on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2501491] [19-38] [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:50 AM]

#10

(#10) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, [8], on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2481405] [19-38] [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:21 AM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#11

(#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to extend time to file brief/memorandum, extension of 30 days to file petition, [9], on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, copy to pro se petitioner, FILED.[2481418] [19-38] [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:30 AM]

#14

(#14) LETTER, dated 02/14/2019, on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, informing the Court the activities in the facility has prevented him from filling out documents and requests an extension of time to file, RECEIVED. Service date 02/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2501487] [19-38] [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:47 AM]

#6

(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2468532] [19-38] [Entered: 01/07/2019 10:48 AM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

7 #2

Supporting Document

7 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 11/26/2018, RECEIVED.[2468488] [19-38] [Entered: 01/07/2019 10:24 AM]

#12

(#12) ORDER, dated 01/29/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/19/2019, unless Petitioner Leslie Hughes, moves for certificate of appealability, copy to pro se petitioner, FILED.[2484005] [19-38] [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:29 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to extend time to file documents, [15], on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2501491] [19-38] [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#15) MOTION, to extend time to file documents, on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, FILED. Service date 02/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2501489] [19-38] [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) LETTER, dated 02/14/2019, on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, informing the Court the activities in the facility has prevented him from filling out documents and requests an extension of time to file, RECEIVED. Service date 02/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2501487] [19-38] [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER, dated 01/29/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/19/2019, unless Petitioner Leslie Hughes, moves for certificate of appealability, copy to pro se petitioner, FILED.[2484005] [19-38] [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to extend time to file brief/memorandum, extension of 30 days to file petition, [9], on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, copy to pro se petitioner, FILED.[2481418] [19-38] [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, [8], on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2481405] [19-38] [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • (#9) MOTION, to extend time to file brief/memorandum, extension of 30 days to file petition, on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, FILED. Service date 01/16/2019 by US mail.[2481402] [19-38] [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Leslie Hughes, FILED. Service date 01/16/2019 by US mail.[2481398] [19-38] [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent United States of America, FILED. Service date 01/08/2019 by US mail.[2469929] [19-38] [Entered: 01/08/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2468532] [19-38] [Entered: 01/07/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2468490] [19-38] [Entered: 01/07/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 11/26/2018, RECEIVED.[2468488] [19-38] [Entered: 01/07/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Petitioner Leslie Hughes, copy to pro se petitioner, FILED. [2468476] [19-38] [Entered: 01/07/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.