This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/10/2021 at 06:10:03 (UTC).

Huddleston v. John Christner Trucking

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Huddleston filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against John Christner Trucking. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5025

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

JOHN CHRISTNER TRUCKING, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

THOMAS HUDDLESTON, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Angela Stemle Cash

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson & Feary

10 West Market Street, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2965

Christopher Eckhart

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson & Feary

10 West Market Street, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2965

Adam Carl Smedstad

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson & Feary

30 West Monroe Street, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60603

James Anthony Eckhart

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson & Feary

10 West Market Street, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2965

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert S. Boulter

Attorney at Robert S Boulter

1101 5Th Ave. Suite 235

San Rafael, CA 94901

Carolyn H. Cottrell

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Michelle S. Lim

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Rachel Lawrence Mor

Attorney at Rachel Lawrence Mor, P.C.

3555 N.W. 58Th Street, Suite 1000

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

Michael J. Blaschke

Attorney at Law Group Joint Venture

3037 Nw 63Rd Street, Suite 205

Oklahoma City, OK 73116

David C. Leimbach

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Preliminary record

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10826612] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file first brief on cross-appeal and appendix until 07/07/2021 for John Christner Trucking, LLC. [21-5023, 21-5025] [Entered: 04/30/2021 02:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10825414] Cross-appeal schedule set. Issued on 04/27/2021. First brief on cross-appeal and appendix due 06/07/2021 for John Christner Trucking, LLC. [21-5023, 21-5025] [Entered: 04/27/2021 08:35 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10825412] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 04/27/2021. [21-5025] [Entered: 04/27/2021 08:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket[10823665] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 04/27/2021 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment). A review of the distirct court docket shows transcripts ordered were already on file. [21-5025] [Entered: 04/20/2021 09:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket[10823553] Attorney Ms. Carolyn H. Cottrell for Thomas Huddleston admitted to the bar of this court. [21-5025] [Entered: 04/19/2021 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket[10822480] Attorney Ms. Michelle S. Lim for Thomas Huddleston admitted to the bar of this court. [21-5025] [Entered: 04/14/2021 04:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket[10822463] Attorney Mr. David C. Leimbach for Thomas Huddleston admitted to the bar of this court. [21-5025] [Entered: 04/14/2021 04:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket[10817932] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 04/08/2021 for Brian Neil, Court Reporter.(10/24/19 Mot hrng & 12/09/20 Sched conf.). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-5025] [Entered: 03/25/2021 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817929] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Thomas Huddleston. Transcript ordered: Motion Hearing Re: Class Certification 10/24/2019 and Scheduling Conference held 12/9/2020. Served on: 03/25/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5025] RLM [Entered: 03/25/2021 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817921] Docketing statement filed by Thomas Huddleston. Served on 03/25/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5025] RLM [Entered: 03/25/2021 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817711] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-5023, 21-5025] [Entered: 03/25/2021 08:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817559] Entry of appearance filed by Adam Carl Smedstad, James Anthony Eckhart, Mrs. Angela Stemle Cashand Christopher Eckhart for John Christner Trucking, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 03/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5025] [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket[10817554] Entry of appearance submitted by Christopher J. Eckhart, Angela S. Cash, James A. Eckhart, Adam C. Smedstad for Appellee John Christner Trucking, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/24/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5025]--[Edited 03/24/2021 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] CE [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10815145] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 04/14/2021 for Michelle S. Lim. [21-5025] [Entered: 03/15/2021 12:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10815141] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 04/14/2021 for David C. Leimbach. [21-5025] [Entered: 03/15/2021 12:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10815131] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 04/14/2021 for Carolyn H. Cottrell. [21-5025] [Entered: 03/15/2021 11:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10814928] Entry of appearance filed by Michael J Blaschke, Mr. Robert S. Boulter, Ms. Carolyn H. Cottrell, Mr. David C. Leimbach, Ms. Michelle S. Lim and Ms. Rachel Lawrence Mor for Thomas Huddleston. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5025] [Entered: 03/12/2021 05:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket[10814925] Entry of appearance submitted by Rachel Lawrence Mor, Michael J. Blaschke, Carolyn Hunt Cottrell, David C. Leimbach, Michelle S. Lim and Robert S. Boulter for Appellant Thomas Huddleston for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-5025]--[Edited 03/12/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 3/12/21.] RLM [Entered: 03/12/2021 04:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10814509] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 03/11/2021. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due on 03/25/2021 for Thomas Huddleston; notice of appearance due on 03-25-2021 for John Christner Trucking, LLC. [21-5025] [Entered: 03/11/2021 03:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where John Christner Trucking, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Samuel Boulter(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Blaschke