This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/23/2022 at 05:14:04 (UTC).

Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. v. Verizon Business Network Services Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 Huawei Technologies Co , Ltd filed an Other lawsuit against Verizon Business Network Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1553

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.

Appellee

VERIZON BUSINESS NETWORK SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Michael Timothy Hawkins

Appellee Attorney

Theodore M. Foster

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

03/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/18/2022. [837933] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/04/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/04/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 04/04/2022. Certified List is due on 05/02/2022. [JCW] [Entered: 03/21/2022 01:24 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less