Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2019 at 06:08:19 (UTC).

Huang v. Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 Huang filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Huawei Technologies Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1726

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

XIAOHUA HUANG

Los Gatos, CA 95031

Defendant / Appellee

HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Xiaohua Huang

Po Box 1639

Los Gatos, CA 95031

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

E. Leon Carter

Attorney at Carter Arnett PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway

Dallas, TX 75206

Scott W. Breedlove Esq.

Attorney at Carter Arnett, PLLC

8150 N Central Expressway

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPLY of Xiaohua Huang to response filed by Appellee [ # 12 ]. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [604045] [MJL] [Entered: 04/30/2019 01:17 PM]

#14

(#14) ORDER filed. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 8 ] is granted. The motion to exceed the page limit [ # 9 ] is granted to the extent that Mr. Huang's informal brief submitted April 23, 2019 (ECF No. 13) is accepted for filing. Huawei's response brief is due no later than 40 days from the date of filing of this order. (Per Curiam). Service: 04/26/2019 by clerk. [603297] [LS] [Entered: 04/26/2019 01:49 PM]

#12

(#12) RESPONSE of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. to the motion [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant Xiaohua Huang. Service: 04/25/2019 by email, US mail. [602921] [19-1726]--[Edited 04/25/2019 by MJL to add party filer] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/25/2019 12:56 PM]

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Response [ # 10 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due 05/01/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [602454] [MJL] [Entered: 04/24/2019 08:33 AM]

#13

(#13) MODIFIED ENTRY: INFORMAL BRIEF FILED for Xiaohua Huang. Number of Pages: 76. Service: 04/21/2019 by US mail. [603082]--[Edited 04/26/2019 by MJL - brief accepted. See order No. [ # 14 ]] [MJL] [Entered: 04/26/2019 08:20 AM]

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to the motion [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant Xiaohua Huang. Service: 04/23/2019 by email, US mail. [602412] [19-1726]. This response is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 11 ]. [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/23/2019 07:19 PM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 04/16/2019 by email, US mail. [600652] [19-1726] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:37 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for E. Leon Carter as of counsel for Appellee Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 04/16/2019 by email, US mail. [600649] [19-1726] [E. Carter] [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:34 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Scott W. Breedlove as principal counsel for Appellee Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 04/16/2019 by email, US mail. [600645] [19-1726] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:31 PM]

#9

(#9) MOTION of Xiaohua Huang to waive the requirements regarding the brief (to add 30 more pages). [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 04/12/2019 by email. [601717] [MJL] [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:58 PM]

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement for the Xiaohua Huang. Service: 04/12/2019 by US mail. [601706] [MJL] [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:52 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for the Xiaohua Huang. Service: 04/19/2019 by clerk. [601703] [MJL] [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:49 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY of Xiaohua Huang to response filed by Appellee [ # 12 ]. Service: 04/25/2019 by email. [604045] [MJL] [Entered: 04/30/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER filed. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 8 ] is granted. The motion to exceed the page limit [ # 9 ] is granted to the extent that Mr. Huang's informal brief submitted April 23, 2019 (ECF No. 13) is accepted for filing. Huawei's response brief is due no later than 40 days from the date of filing of this order. (Per Curiam). Service: 04/26/2019 by clerk. [603297] [LS] [Entered: 04/26/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. to the motion [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant Xiaohua Huang. Service: 04/25/2019 by email, US mail. [602921] [19-1726]--[Edited 04/25/2019 by MJL to add party filer] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/25/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Response [ # 10 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due 05/01/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [602454] [MJL] [Entered: 04/24/2019 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MODIFIED ENTRY: INFORMAL BRIEF FILED for Xiaohua Huang. Number of Pages: 76. Service: 04/21/2019 by US mail. [603082]--[Edited 04/26/2019 by MJL - brief accepted. See order No. [ # 14 ]] [MJL] [Entered: 04/26/2019 08:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE to the motion [ # 9 ] filed by Appellant Xiaohua Huang. Service: 04/23/2019 by email, US mail. [602412] [19-1726]. This response is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 11 ]. [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/23/2019 07:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: ERROR: The contact information on the entries of appearance (EOA) for Scott W. Breedlove [ # 2 ] and E. Leon Carter [ # 3 ] does not match the information in the attorneys' user accounts. CORRECTION: Pursuant to FCR 47.3(c)(1), please update as needed to ensure the information on the EOAs and in the user accountes matches. [601701] [MJL] [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 04/16/2019 by email, US mail. [600652] [19-1726] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for E. Leon Carter as of counsel for Appellee Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 04/16/2019 by email, US mail. [600649] [19-1726] [E. Carter] [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Scott W. Breedlove as principal counsel for Appellee Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Service: 04/16/2019 by email, US mail. [600645] [19-1726] [Scott Breedlove] [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION of Xiaohua Huang to waive the requirements regarding the brief (to add 30 more pages). [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 04/12/2019 by email. [601717] [MJL] [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION of Xiaohua Huang for leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis. Service: 04/19/2019 by clerk. [601714] [MJL] [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Docketing Statement for the Xiaohua Huang. Service: 04/12/2019 by US mail. [601706] [MJL] [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for the Xiaohua Huang. Service: 04/19/2019 by clerk. [601703] [MJL] [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/25/2019. [597240] Fee/IFP due 04/16/2019. Entry of Appearance due 04/16/2019. Certificate of Interest due 04/16/2019. Appellant's informal brief due 04/23/2019. [MJL] [Entered: 04/02/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edgar Leon Carter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Wayne Breedlove