This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/16/2021 at 06:04:48 (UTC).

Howard Linden v. Bradley Dixon, et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Howard Linden filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Bradley Dixon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1265

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant

BRADLEY DIXON

Plaintiff / Appellee

HOWARD T. LINDEN, As Personal Representative of the Estate of Omarion Humphrey, Deceased

Defendant / Appellant

ALISIA JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Todd J. Weglarz

Attorney at Fieger, Fieger, Kenney & Harrington

19390 W. Ten Mile Road

Southfield, MI 48075

Stephanie Lee Arndt

Attorney at Vandeveer Garzia

840 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 600

Troy, MI 48098

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Cassandra A. Drysdale-Crown

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48909

Neil Anthony Giovanatti

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48917

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/12/2021. appellee brief now due 08/13/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 05/10/2021 10:29 AM]

#11

(#11) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/11/2021;. appellee brief due 06/10/2021; (CAM) [Entered: 04/01/2021 04:01 PM]

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Neil Anthony Giovanatti for Appellant Alisia Johnson Certificate of Service: 03/30/2021. [21-1265] (NAG) [Entered: 03/30/2021 02:01 PM]

#7

(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Neil Anthony Giovanatti for Appellant Alisia Johnson.. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2021. [21-1265] (NAG) [Entered: 03/30/2021 02:00 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alisia Johnson by Neil Giovanatti. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2021. [21-1265] (NAG) [Entered: 03/30/2021 01:58 PM]

#5

(#5) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 04/13/2021 is hereby canceled and may be rescheduled at a future date. (LMR) [Entered: 03/29/2021 05:11 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/18/2021 10:43 AM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Alisia Johnson. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 03/17/2021 10:06 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 07/12/2021. appellee brief now due 08/13/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 05/10/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/11/2021;. appellee brief due 06/10/2021; (CAM) [Entered: 04/01/2021 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#10) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Neil Anthony Giovanatti for Alisia Johnson. Certificate of Service: 04/01/2021. [21-1265] (NAG) [Entered: 04/01/2021 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE: The initial transcript order has not been completed by the appellant. If not completed by 04/05/2021 further action will be taken. (CAM) [Entered: 04/01/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Neil Anthony Giovanatti for Appellant Alisia Johnson Certificate of Service: 03/30/2021. [21-1265] (NAG) [Entered: 03/30/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Neil Anthony Giovanatti for Appellant Alisia Johnson.. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2021. [21-1265] (NAG) [Entered: 03/30/2021 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Alisia Johnson by Neil Giovanatti. Certificate of Service: 03/30/2021. [21-1265] (NAG) [Entered: 03/30/2021 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter sent by Mediation Office REGARDING MEDIATION: The Mediation Conference scheduled for 04/13/2021 is hereby canceled and may be rescheduled at a future date. (LMR) [Entered: 03/29/2021 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 04/13/2021 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 03/18/2021 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 03/18/2021 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 03/17/2021 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Alisia Johnson. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 03/17/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil Anthony Giovanatti