This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:18 (UTC).

Hourihan v. Bitinas, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Hourihan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Bitinas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1708

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

PAUL MACDONALD

BARNSTABLE, MA

ANDREW MCKENNA

ROBERT BITINAS

Plaintiff / Appellant

HAROLD HOURIHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stephen C. Pfaff

Attorney at Louison Costello Condon & Pfaff LLP

101 Summer St, 4Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Douglas I. Louison

Attorney at Louison Costello Condon & Pfaff LLP

101 Summer St, 4Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard K. Latimer

Attorney at Richard K. Latimer, Attorney at Law

222 Main Street, Suite 204

Falmouth, MA 02540-0000

Henry F. Owens III

22 Liberty Dr

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:23 PM]

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document #1

Transcript Order Form

Open Document

STATEMENT of the issues filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan. Certificate of service dated 07/23/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:33 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 07/23/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:30 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Henry F. Owens, III for Harold Hourihan. [19-1708] (TS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:17 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Barnstable, MA and Appellees Robert Bitinas, Paul MacDonald and Andrew McKenna filed by Attorney Stephen C. Pfaff. Certificate of service dated 07/23/2019. [19-1708] (SCP) [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:50 AM]

Open Document

REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Henry F. Owens, III for Appellant Harold Hourihan. Certificate of service dated 07/20/2019. [19-1708] (TS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:08 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE of service for certificate of service [ # 6269217-2 ], notice of appearance [ # 6269187-2 ] filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:54 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6269187-2 ] filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:48 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Harold Hourihan filed by Attorney Richard K. Latimer. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1708] CLERK'S NOTE: The wrong PDF file was attached. Notice of Appearance was not attached. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, 07/25/19. (RKL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:12 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 10/02/2019 for appellant Harold Hourihan. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1708] (ALW) [Entered: 08/23/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • NOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter Cheryl Dahlstrom: 01/14/2019, EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Six (Jury Charge); 01/08/2019, EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Two (Testimony of Daniel C. Parker); 01/09/2019, EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Three (Testimony of Daniel C. Parker); 01/10/2019, EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Four (Testimony of Harold T. Hourihan, Jr.); 01/09/2019, EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Three (Testimony of Harold T. Hourihan, Jr.). In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [19-1708] (ALW) [Entered: 08/23/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/24/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ordered: 01/14/2019, Jury Instructions; 01/08/2019, Jury Trial; 01/09/2019, Jury Trial; 01/10/2019, Jury Trial. Transcript(s) due 09/23/2019 from Court Reporter Cheryl Dahlstrom [19-1708] (ALW) [Entered: 07/24/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT of the issues filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan. Certificate of service dated 07/23/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 07/23/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Harold Hourihan filed by Attorney Richard K. Latimer. Certificate of service dated 07/23/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Henry F. Owens, III for Harold Hourihan. [19-1708] (TS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Barnstable, MA and Appellees Robert Bitinas, Paul MacDonald and Andrew McKenna filed by Attorney Stephen C. Pfaff. Certificate of service dated 07/23/2019. [19-1708] (SCP) [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Henry F. Owens, III for Appellant Harold Hourihan. Certificate of service dated 07/20/2019. [19-1708] (TS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE of service for certificate of service [ # 6269217-2 ], notice of appearance [ # 6269187-2 ] filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE of service for notice of appearance [ # 6269187-2 ] filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1708] (RKL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Harold Hourihan filed by Attorney Richard K. Latimer. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1708] CLERK'S NOTE: The wrong PDF file was attached. Notice of Appearance was not attached. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, 07/25/19. (RKL) [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #141) filed by Appellant Harold Hourihan. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 07/30/2019. [19-1708] (TS) [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.