This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/12/2021 at 06:05:45 (UTC).

Hotze v. Abbott

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 Hotze filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Abbott. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-20425

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Steven Hotze

Hotze Health & Wellness Center

Edd Hendee

Taste of Texas Restaurant

Physicians Preference Pharmacy International, L.L.C.

Curam Health, L.L.C.

Defendant / Appellees

Greg Abbott

State of Texas

Texas Department of State Health Services

Phil Wilson

John William Hellerstedt

Bentley Nettles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jared Ryker Woodfill V

Attorney at Woodfill Law Firm

3 Riverway

Houston, TX 77056

Andrew Layton Schlafly

939 Old Chester Road

Far Hills, NJ 07931-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Courtney Brooke Corbello

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Cody Coll Esq.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548 (Mc 059)

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Matthew Tyler Bohuslav

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 W. 15Th Street, William P. Clements Building

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Cody Coll for party(s) Appellee Greg Abbott, in case 21-20425 [21-20425] (RLL) [Entered: 10/08/2021 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20425] (Cody Coll ) [Entered: 10/08/2021 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Courtney Brooke Corbello for party(s) Appellee Greg Abbott, in case 21-20425 [21-20425] (ABT) [Entered: 10/06/2021 08:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20425] (Courtney Brooke Corbello ) [Entered: 09/27/2021 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Matthew Tyler Bohuslav for party(s) Appellee Greg Abbott, in case 21-20425 [21-20425] (ABT) [Entered: 09/13/2021 07:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Matthew Tyler Bohuslav for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20425] (Matthew Tyler Bohuslav ) [Entered: 09/09/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Matthew Tyler Bohuslav is designated as inactive in this case for all other appellees. Reason:only represents Greg Abbott. [21-20425] (SDH) [Entered: 09/09/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/18/2021 for Appellants Curam Health, L.L.C., Edd Hendee, Steven Hotze, Hotze Health & Wellness Center, Physicians Preference Pharmacy International, L.L.C. and Taste of Texas Restaurant. [21-20425] (CMB) [Entered: 09/07/2021 07:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-20425] (CMB) [Entered: 09/07/2021 07:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andrew Layton Schlafly for party(s) Appellant Steven Hotze Appellant Hotze Health & Wellness Center Appellant Taste of Texas Restaurant Appellant Physicians Preference Pharmacy International, L.L.C. Appellant Edd Hendee Appellant Curam Health, L.L.C., in case 21-20425 [21-20425] (ABT) [Entered: 09/02/2021 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20425] (Andrew Layton Schlafly ) [Entered: 08/26/2021 08:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-2918. Electronic ROA due on 09/09/2021. [21-20425] (RLL) [Entered: 08/25/2021 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9652499-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-20425] (RLL) [Entered: 08/25/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketPARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [21-20425] (ABT) [Entered: 08/17/2021 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Curam Health L.L.C., Mr. Edd Hendee, Mr. Steven Hotze, Hotze Health & Wellness Center, Physicians Preference Pharmacy International, L.L.C. and Taste of Texas Restaurant [21-20425] (ABT) [Entered: 08/13/2021 05:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hotze Health and Wellness Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Texas Department of State Health Services, Vital Statistics Unit is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Tyler Bohuslav

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtney Brooke Corbello