This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/21/2022 at 06:01:29 (UTC).

Home Depot USA Inc v. Lafarge North America Inc

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Home Depot USA Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Lafarge North America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1122

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

HOME DEPOT USA INC

Defendant / Appellee

LAFARGE NORTH AMERICA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Peter E. Davis Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

555 11Th Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Caroline A. Flynn Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

555 11Th Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Lindsay S. Johnson Esq.

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner

1201 West Peachtree Street, N.W., One Atlantic Center, 14Th Floor

Atlanta, GA 30309

Ronan P. Doherty Esq.

Attorney at Bondurant Mixson & Elmore

1201 West Peachtree Street, N.W., 3900 One Atlantic Center

Atlanta, GA 30309

Frank M. Lowrey Esq. IV

Attorney at Bondurant Mixson & Elmore

1201 West Peachtree Street, N.W., 3900 One Atlantic Center

Atlanta, GA 30309

Roman Martinez Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

555 11Th Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

George P. Watson Esq.

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner

1201 West Peachtree Street, N.W., One Atlantic Center, 14Th Floor

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Betsy Farrington Esq.

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum

200 South Wacker Drive, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Tarek Ismail Esq.

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum

200 South Wacker Drive, 22Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellee Lafarge North America Inc for Extension of Time to file Response Brief until/for May 13, 2022. Certificate of Service dated 03/17/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-1122] (TI) [Entered: 03/17/2022 10:17 AM]

#26

(#26) ECF FILER: Supplement filed by Appellant Home Depot USA Inc in Support of Motion for Continued Impoundment. Certificate of Service dated 03/15/2022. [22-1122]--[Edited 03/16/2022 by CJG] (RM) [Entered: 03/15/2022 05:30 PM]

#24

(#24) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney Roman Martinez, Esq. for Appellant Home Depot USA Inc to file Addendum to Appendix with Notice of Appeal. Addendum must be filed in electronic and paper copy format (4 copies in white covers). Due on or before 03/18/2022. (MS) [Entered: 03/15/2022 10:33 AM]

23 #2

SEALED Joint Appendix Volume 7

23 #1

SEALED Joint Appendix Volume 6

22 #4

Exhibit C

22 #3

Exhibit B

22 #2

Exhibit A

22 #1

Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Sealed Appendix Volumes

6 #1

Concise Summary of the Case

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Home Depot USA Inc. [22-1122] (RM) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:50 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Home Depot USA Inc. [22-1122] (RM) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:48 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roman Martinez on behalf of Appellant(s) Home Depot USA, Inc.. [22-1122] (RM) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:45 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order 11/08/21

1 #2

District Court Memorandum 11/08/21

#1

Civil Case Docketed

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellee Lafarge North America Inc for Extension of Time to file Response Brief until/for May 13, 2022. Certificate of Service dated 03/17/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-1122] (TI) [Entered: 03/17/2022 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ECF FILER: Supplement filed by Appellant Home Depot USA Inc in Support of Motion for Continued Impoundment. Certificate of Service dated 03/15/2022. [22-1122]--[Edited 03/16/2022 by CJG] (RM) [Entered: 03/15/2022 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docket(#25) COMPLIANCE RECEIVED. Order for permission to appeal is included in Vol. I of Appellant's appendix. Addendum with notice of appeal is not needed. (MS) [Entered: 03/15/2022 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) directing Attorney Roman Martinez, Esq. for Appellant Home Depot USA Inc to file Addendum to Appendix with Notice of Appeal. Addendum must be filed in electronic and paper copy format (4 copies in white covers). Due on or before 03/18/2022. (MS) [Entered: 03/15/2022 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ECF FILER: SEALED ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX Volumes 6 & 7 on behalf of Appellant Home Depot USA Inc. Certificate of Service dated 03/14/2022 by Email. [22-1122]--[Edited 03/15/2022 by MS] (RM) [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Home Depot USA Inc to seal Volumes 6 and 7 of Joint Appendix. Certificate of Service dated 03/14/2022. Service made by ECF. [22-1122] (RM) [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX Volumes 2 - 5 and redacted Volume 6 on behalf of Appellant Home Depot USA Inc. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2022 by ECF. [22-1122]--[Edited 03/15/2022 by MS] (RM) [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Home Depot USA Inc. Certificate of Service dated 03/14/2022 by ECF. [22-1122] (RM) [Entered: 03/14/2022 11:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER (Clerk) Action on the motion to continue impoundment is deferred. Appellant does not identify the documents that will be included in the joint appendix that Appellant wishes to file under seal. Appellant is directed to file a supplement to the motion identifying the particular documents and stating with particularity why each document should be sealed as required by 3d Cir. L.A.R. Misc. 106.1(a). See also In re Cendent Corp., 260 F.3d 183, 194 (3d Cir. 2001)(explaining the showing necessary to overcome the right of public access). It is not sufficient to merely state that the documents were designated as confidential in the district court. The supplement must be filed within 7 days of the date of this order. (CJG) [Entered: 03/08/2022 08:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ronan P. Doherty on behalf of Appellant(s) Home Depot USA, Inc.. [22-1122] (RPD) [Entered: 02/10/2022 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lindsay Sklar Johnson on behalf of Appellant(s) Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. [22-1122] (LSJ) [Entered: 01/31/2022 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Peter E. Davis on behalf of Appellant(s) Home Depot USA, Inc.. [22-1122] (PED) [Entered: 01/28/2022 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Caroline A. Flynn on behalf of Appellant(s) Home Depot USA, Inc.. [22-1122] (CAF) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Home Depot USA Inc advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [22-1122] (RM) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Home Depot USA Inc. [22-1122] (RM) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Home Depot USA Inc. [22-1122] (RM) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Home Depot USA Inc. [22-1122] (RM) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Roman Martinez on behalf of Appellant(s) Home Depot USA, Inc.. [22-1122] (RM) [Entered: 01/28/2022 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 01/20/2022 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Home Depot USA Inc in District Court No. 2-18-cv-05305 transferred from misc. docket no. 21-8049. (CJG) [Entered: 01/20/2022 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LaFarge North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tarek Ismail