This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/20/2019 at 06:04:58 (UTC).

Hologic, Inc. v. Minerva Surgical, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Hologic, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Minerva Surgical, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2054

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant / Cross Appellant

MINERVA SURGICAL, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellants

CYTYC SURGICAL PRODUCTS, LLC

HOLOGIC, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant / Cross Appellant Attorneys

Jillian Stonecipher

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

One S Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Edward Poplawski

Attorney at Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.

633 West 5Th Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Vera Elson

Attorney at Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati, PC

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Caroline A. Wong

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1 S Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Olivia M. Kim Esq.

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

633 West Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert N. Hochman

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

Bank One Plaza, 1 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Marc A. Cohn

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Jennifer Sklenar

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Matthew Wolf

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#21

#20

#17

#16

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • (#26) MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED CONFIDENTIAL OPENING BRIEF FILED for Appellants Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc. Number of Pages: 71. Service: 07/31/2019 by email. [625031]--[Edited 08/01/2019 by TAM - compliance review complete] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MODIFIED ENTRY: CORRECTED OPENING BRIEF FILED for Appellants Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc. Number of Pages: 71. Service: 07/31/2019 by email. [625030] --[Edited 08/01/2019 by TAM - compliance review complete] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellants Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc., Confidential and Non-Confidential Opening Briefs [22], [ # 23 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 08/01/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [623538] [TAM] [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) FILED from Appellants Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc.. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621121] [19-2054] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 24 ] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#22) FILED from Appellants Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc.. Title: CONFIDENTIAL OPENING BRIEF. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621120] [19-2054] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 24 ] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 07/15/2019 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER filed. The motion [ # 4 ] is granted to the extent that Hologic's opening brief is due no later than July 15, 2019; Minerva's principal-and-response brief is due no later than August 26, 2019; Hologic's response-and-reply brief is due no later than September 9, 2019; Minerva's reply brief is due no later than September 23, 2019; the joint appendix is due no later than September 30, 2019; and the case will be placed on the December 2019 oral argument calendar. Service: 07/03/2019 by clerk. [618968] [LMS] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc.. Service: 07/03/2019 by email. [618906] [19-2054] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 07/03/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • (#19) Official caption revised to reflect Cross-Appeal. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of thAs date by the Clerk of Court. [618509] [TAM] [Entered: 07/02/2019 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • (#18) Note to file: The following cases are associated:19-2054 (Lead) with 19-2081 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [618504] [19-2054, 19-2081] [TAM] [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPLY of Appellants Hologic, Inc. and Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC to response [ # 16 ]. Service: 07/01/2019 by email. [618214] [19-2054] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 07/01/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Entry of appearance for Jillian Sheridan Stonecipher as of counsel for Appellee Minerva Surgical, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2019 by email. [617825] [19-2054] [Jillian Stonecipher] [Entered: 06/28/2019 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of appearance for Caroline A. Wong as of counsel for Appellee Minerva Surgical, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2019 by email. [617824] [19-2054] [Caroline Wong] [Entered: 06/28/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Robert N. Hochman as principal counsel for Appellee Minerva Surgical, Inc.. Service: 06/28/2019 by email. [617823] [19-2054] [Robert Hochman] [Entered: 06/28/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER filed. Any opposition to the motion [ # 4 ] is due no later than June 28, 2019. Any reply in support of the motion is due no later than July 1, 2019. Service: 06/21/2019 by clerk. [616093] [LS] [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Marc A. Cohn as of counsel for Appellants Hologic, Inc. and Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616039] [19-2054] [Marc Cohn] [Entered: 06/21/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Jennifer A. Sklenar as of counsel for Appellants Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616038] [19-2054] [Jennifer Sklenar] [Entered: 06/21/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION of Appellants Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc. to expedite briefing schedule [Consent: opposed]. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616037] [19-2054] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 06/21/2019 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Hologic, Inc. and Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616035] [19-2054] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 06/21/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Matthew M. Wolf as principal counsel for Appellants Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC and Hologic, Inc.. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616034] [19-2054] [Matthew Wolf] [Entered: 06/21/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/18/2019. [615979] Entry of Appearance due 07/05/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/05/2019. Docketing Statement due 07/05/2019. Appellant's brief is due 08/20/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 06/21/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLOGIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc A. Cohn