Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2020 at 06:00:58 (UTC).

Holick v. Cellular Sales of New York, LL

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 Holick filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Cellular Sales of New York, LL. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2037

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Gurwinder Singh, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Jason Mack, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Jan P. Holick, Jr., on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

William Burrell, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated,

Steven Moffitt, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Timothy M. Pratt, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated,

Justin Moffitt, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellees

Cellular Sales of New York, LLC

Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ronald G. Dunn Esq.

Attorney at Gleason, Dunn, Walsh & O'Shea

40 Beaver Street

Albany, NY 12207

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Charles Larry Carbo Esq. III

Attorney at Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry

1200 Smith Street

Houston, TX 77002

Joseph Matthew Dougherty Esq.

Attorney at Joseph M. Dougherty, Esq.

1900 E Ocean Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90802

Benjamin M. Wilkinson Esq.

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

80 State Street

Albany, NY 12207

Julie Offerman Esq.

Attorney at Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry

1200 Smith Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#56

(#56) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2900695] [20-2212] [Entered: 08/05/2020 09:33 AM]

#44

(#44) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, in docket # 20-2037, ASSIGNED.[2889293] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:07 PM]

#41

(#41) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh in 20-2037, Appellee William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh in 20-2212, informing Court of proposed due date 10/09/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2889053] [20-2037, 20-2212] [Entered: 07/21/2020 01:37 PM]

#37

(#37) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [32], on behalf of Appellant Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc. and Cellular Sales of New York, LLC, FILED.[2888789] [20-2212] [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:51 AM]

#33

(#33) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [32], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc. and Cellular Sales of New York, LLC, FILED.[2885274] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:02 PM]

#28

(#28) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh, FILED. Service date 07/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2884042] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:54 PM]

#25

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#15

(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881962] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/10/2020 03:02 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 04/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2873033] [20-2037] [Entered: 06/29/2020 12:46 PM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2900695] [20-2212] [Entered: 08/05/2020 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellants-Cross-Appellees William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh Brief due date as 10/09/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 10/09/2020, FILED.[2889551] [20-2037, 20-2212] [Entered: 07/22/2020 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, in docket # 20-2037, ASSIGNED.[2889293] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/21/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh in 20-2037, Appellee William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh in 20-2212, informing Court of proposed due date 10/09/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2889053] [20-2037, 20-2212] [Entered: 07/21/2020 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee-Cross-Appellant Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc. and Cellular Sales of New York, LLC NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [32] from the docket, FILED.[2888801] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [32], on behalf of Appellant Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc. and Cellular Sales of New York, LLC, FILED.[2888789] [20-2212] [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [32], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc. and Cellular Sales of New York, LLC, FILED.[2885274] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/15/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc. and Cellular Sales of New York, LLC in 20-2037, Appellant Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc. and Cellular Sales of New York, LLC in 20-2212, FILED. Service date 07/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2885044] [20-2037, 20-2212] [Entered: 07/15/2020 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 28 ], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh, FILED.[2884145] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/14/2020 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh, FILED. Service date 07/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2884042] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docket(#16) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881966] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/10/2020 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881962] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/10/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc. and Cellular Sales of New York, LLC, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2881787] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/10/2020 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc. and Cellular Sales of New York, LLC, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881767] [20-2037] [Entered: 07/10/2020 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docket(#9) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Benjamin M. Wilkinson, Esq. for Appellee Cellular Sales of New York, LLC and Cellular Sales of Knoxville, Inc., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2873240] [20-2037] [Entered: 06/29/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2873048] [20-2037] [Entered: 06/29/2020 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5155473, FILED.[2873040] [20-2037] [Entered: 06/29/2020 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 07/19/2019, RECEIVED.[2873037] [20-2037] [Entered: 06/29/2020 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 04/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2873033] [20-2037] [Entered: 06/29/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant William Burrell, Jan P. Holick, Jr., Jason Mack, Justin Moffitt, Steven Moffitt, Timothy M. Pratt and Gurwinder Singh, FILED. [2873016] [20-2037] [Entered: 06/29/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cellular Sales of New York, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph M. Dougherty