This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/14/2022 at 06:05:30 (UTC).

Holberg v. Lumpkin

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Holberg filed a Prisoner - Death Penalty lawsuit against Lumpkin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-70010

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Death Penalty

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

Brittany Marlowe Holberg

Respondent / Appellee

Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Alan J. Lazarus

50 Fremont Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2235

Alan J. Lazarus Esq.

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath, L.L.P.

4 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111-4180

Paul Edward Mansur

114 S. Main Street

Seminole, TX 79323

Anton Stewart

Attorney at Faegre, Drinker, Biddle & Reath, L.L.P.

1717 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75201-7367

Alan Ray Vickery

Attorney at Faegre, Drinker, Biddle & Reath, L.L.P.

1717 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75201-7367

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Travis Golden Bragg

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

Edward Larry Marshall

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

 

Court Documents

Open Document

DEATH PENALTY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 12/16/2021 08:11 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9735981-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 01/03/2022 for Appellant Brittany Marlowe Holberg [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 12/16/2021 10:49 AM]

Open Document

CJA APPOINTMENT for Attorney Mr. Paul Edward Mansur for Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg. Counsel must use the eVoucher system to file the voucher at disposition of the case. Please see the attached document for further guidance. ORIGINATING COURT DISTRICT: NTX ORIGINATING CASE NUMBER: 2:15-CV-285 DATE OF APPOINTMENT: 12/14/2021 [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:01 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-70010] (Travis Golden Bragg ) [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:28 AM]

Open Document

SHOW CAUSE ORDER issued to Mr. Alan J. Lazarus for Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg and Mr. Paul Edward Mansur for Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[9752352-2] Transcript Order deadline updated to 01/26/2022 for Appellant Brittany Marlowe Holberg. [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 01/11/2022 08:32 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-70010] (Anton Stewart ) [Entered: 01/13/2022 11:04 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-70010] (Alan Ray Vickery ) [Entered: 01/13/2022 11:48 AM]

Open Document

Attorney Anton J. Stewart is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. [21-70010] (BF) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:02 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-70010] (Anton Stewart ) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:07 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Alan J. Lazarus, Esq. for Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-70010] (Alan J. Lazarus ) [Entered: 01/20/2022 12:39 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9759415-1] to the Show Cause Order for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter filed by Mr. Paul Edward Mansur and Mr. Alan J. Lazarus, Esq. in 21-70010 [ # 9752352-2 ] [21-70010] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg [9759415-1] to the Show Cause Order filed by Mr. Alan J. Lazarus, Esq. for Appellant Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg and Mr. Paul Edward Mansur for Appellant Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg [ # 9752352-2 ] Date of Service: 01/20/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bragg, Marshall; Attorney for Appellants: Lazarus, Mansur, Stewart, Vickery. [21-70010] (Alan J. Lazarus ) [Entered: 01/20/2022 01:08 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-70010] (Paul Edward Mansur ) [Entered: 01/26/2022 04:54 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE [9764000-1] [21-70010] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE filed by Attorney Mr. Paul Edward Mansur for Appellant Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg [9764000-1] to the Show Cause Order for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter [ # 9752352-2 ] Date of Service: 01/26/2022. [21-70010] (Paul Edward Mansur ) [Entered: 01/26/2022 04:56 PM]

Open Document

LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 03/14/2022 for Appellant Brittany Marlowe Holberg. Brief in Support due on 03/14/2022 for Appellant Brittany Marlowe Holberg [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 02/02/2022 04:20 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 03/14/2022 for Appellant Brittany Marlowe Holberg. Brief in Support due on 03/14/2022 for Appellant Brittany Marlowe Holberg [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 02/02/2022 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketExhibits, 1 envelope (State Court Record on 25 CDs), FILED [21-70010] (DDL) [Entered: 02/02/2022 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Paul Edward Mansur for Appellant Brittany Marlowe Holberg in 21-70010 [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 01/27/2022 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketPAPER STATE COURT PAPERS REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:15-CV-285. State Court Papers due on 02/11/2022. [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 01/27/2022 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 01/27/2022 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE [9764000-1] [21-70010] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE filed by Attorney Mr. Paul Edward Mansur for Appellant Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg [9764000-1] to the Show Cause Order for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter [ # 9752352-2 ] Date of Service: 01/26/2022. [21-70010] (Paul Edward Mansur ) [Entered: 01/26/2022 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-70010] (Paul Edward Mansur ) [Entered: 01/26/2022 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Alan J. Lazarus for Appellant Brittany Marlowe Holberg in 21-70010 [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 01/21/2022 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9759415-1] to the Show Cause Order for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter filed by Mr. Paul Edward Mansur and Mr. Alan J. Lazarus, Esq. in 21-70010 [ # 9752352-2 ] [21-70010] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg [9759415-1] to the Show Cause Order filed by Mr. Alan J. Lazarus, Esq. for Appellant Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg and Mr. Paul Edward Mansur for Appellant Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg [ # 9752352-2 ] Date of Service: 01/20/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bragg, Marshall; Attorney for Appellants: Lazarus, Mansur, Stewart, Vickery. [21-70010] (Alan J. Lazarus ) [Entered: 01/20/2022 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Alan J. Lazarus, Esq. for Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-70010] (Alan J. Lazarus ) [Entered: 01/20/2022 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-70010] (Anton Stewart ) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Anton J. Stewart is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. [21-70010] (BF) [Entered: 01/13/2022 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-70010] (Alan Ray Vickery ) [Entered: 01/13/2022 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-70010] (Anton Stewart ) [Entered: 01/13/2022 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHOW CAUSE ORDER issued to Mr. Alan J. Lazarus for Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg and Mr. Paul Edward Mansur for Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[9752352-2] Transcript Order deadline updated to 01/26/2022 for Appellant Brittany Marlowe Holberg. [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 01/11/2022 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Travis Golden Bragg for party(s) Appellee Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division, in case 21-70010 [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 12/17/2021 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-70010] (Travis Golden Bragg ) [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCJA APPOINTMENT for Attorney Mr. Paul Edward Mansur for Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg. Counsel must use the eVoucher system to file the voucher at disposition of the case. Please see the attached document for further guidance. ORIGINATING COURT DISTRICT: NTX ORIGINATING CASE NUMBER: 2:15-CV-285 DATE OF APPOINTMENT: 12/14/2021 [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 12/16/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9735981-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 01/03/2022 for Appellant Brittany Marlowe Holberg [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 12/16/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEATH PENALTY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Brittany Marlowe Holberg [21-70010] (MRW) [Entered: 12/16/2021 08:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis Golden Bragg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Larry Marshall