This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2020 at 11:01:38 (UTC).

hiQ Labs, Inc. v. LinkedIn Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 hiQ Labs, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against LinkedIn Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-16783

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Amicus Curiae

SCRAPING HUB, LTD.

ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, DUCKDUCKGO, AND INTERNET ARCHIVE

ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER

CRAIGSLIST, INC.

COSTAR GROUP, INC.

3TAPS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

HIQ LABS, INC.

Defendant / Appellant

LINKEDIN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Kenneth L. Wilton Esquire

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw, LLP

2029 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3021

Jamie Lee Williams Esquire

Attorney at Electronic Frontier Foundation

815 Eddy Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Marc Rotenberg

Attorney at Electronic Privacy Information Center

1519 New Hampshire Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Perry J. Viscounty

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

650 Town Center Drive

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Nicholas Boyle

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Thomas V. Christopher Esquire

Attorney at The Law Offices of Thomas V. Christopher

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Rebecca H. Stephens Esquire

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Deepak Gupta

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Carl Brandon Wisoff Esquire

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Thomas Dietrich Hill

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Jeffrey Lau

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Aaron Martin Panner

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Eric Shumsky

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-1706

Jonathan H. Blavin

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Nicholas Fram

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Chad Golder

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

1155 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

E. Joshua Rosenkranz

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019-6142

Rosemarie T. Ring

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Donald Beaton Verrilli Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

1155 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Brian Philip Goldman

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#91

(#91) Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 19-1116 Filed on: 03/09/2020 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending [11629216] (RR) [Entered: 03/13/2020 11:23 AM]

#90

(#90) Received letter from the Supreme Court dated 01/23/2020. The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kagan, who on January 23, 2020, extended the time to and including March 9, 2020. [11598607] (RR) [Entered: 02/14/2020 03:52 PM]

#89

(#89) MANDATE ISSUED.(JCW, MSB and TGB) [11503862] (QDL) [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:22 AM]

#87

(#87) Filed (ECF) Appellant LinkedIn Corporation Motion to stay the mandate. Date of service: 11/14/2019. [11499737] [17-16783] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 11/14/2019 04:35 PM]

#86

(#86) Filed order (J. CLIFFORD WALLACE, MARSHA S. BERZON and TERRENCE BERG) The panel has unanimously voted to deny appellants petition for rehearing. Judge Berzon has voted to deny the petition for rehearing en banc. Judge Wallace and Judge Berg recommend denial of the petition for rehearing en banc. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc, and no judge has requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petition for rehearing is denied and the petition for rehearing en banc is rejected. [11493577] (OC) [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:35 AM]

#84

(#84) Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Electronic Privacy Information Center Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Have Previously Filed Brief for Amicus Curiae in Support of Neither Party Considered in Support of Defendant-Appellant's Petition for Rehearing and Rehearing En Banc]. Date of service: 10/21/2019. [11472210] [17-16783] (Rotenberg, Marc) [Entered: 10/21/2019 07:58 PM]

#82

(#82) Filed (ECF) Appellant LinkedIn Corporation petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 09/09/2019 opinion). Date of service: 10/11/2019. [11462810] [17-16783] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 10/11/2019 05:05 PM]

7 #1

ER Vol 1

#6

(#6) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant LinkedIn Corporation. Date of service: 10/03/2017. [10604424] [17-16783] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 10/03/2017 03:22 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 11/28/2017, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [10594798] (BS) [Entered: 09/26/2017 01:33 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 09/25/2017, 1:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [10582593] (BS) [Entered: 09/15/2017 10:43 AM]

3 #2

Additional Document

3 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: ME): The appeal filed September 5, 2017 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than October 3, 2017; the answering brief is due October 31, 2017 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The parties are reminded that streamlined requests for extensions of time are not available in preliminary injunction appeals. See http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/content/view.php?pk_id=0000000638. Any request for an extension of time must be requested under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [10571779] (ME) [Entered: 09/06/2017 05:11 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 19-1116 Filed on: 03/09/2020 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending [11629216] (RR) [Entered: 03/13/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Received letter from the Supreme Court dated 01/23/2020. The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kagan, who on January 23, 2020, extended the time to and including March 9, 2020. [11598607] (RR) [Entered: 02/14/2020 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) MANDATE ISSUED.(JCW, MSB and TGB) [11503862] (QDL) [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Filed text clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AF): Appellant LinkedIn Corporation's motion to stay the mandate (Dkt. [ # 87 ]) is denied. [11503834] (AF) [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) Filed (ECF) Appellant LinkedIn Corporation Motion to stay the mandate. Date of service: 11/14/2019. [11499737] [17-16783] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 11/14/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) Filed order (J. CLIFFORD WALLACE, MARSHA S. BERZON and TERRENCE BERG) The panel has unanimously voted to deny appellants petition for rehearing. Judge Berzon has voted to deny the petition for rehearing en banc. Judge Wallace and Judge Berg recommend denial of the petition for rehearing en banc. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc, and no judge has requested a vote on whether to rehear the matter en banc. Fed. R. App. P. 35. The petition for rehearing is denied and the petition for rehearing en banc is rejected. [11493577] (OC) [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • (#85) Added Attorney(s) Alan J. Butler for party(s) Amicus Curiae Electronic Privacy Information Center, in case 17-16783. [11472450] (QDL) [Entered: 10/22/2019 09:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) Filed (ECF) Amicus Curiae Electronic Privacy Information Center Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Have Previously Filed Brief for Amicus Curiae in Support of Neither Party Considered in Support of Defendant-Appellant's Petition for Rehearing and Rehearing En Banc]. Date of service: 10/21/2019. [11472210] [17-16783] (Rotenberg, Marc) [Entered: 10/21/2019 07:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • (#83) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alan Jay Butler (Electronic Privacy Information Center, 1519 New Hampshire Ave. NW, Washington, DC 20036) for Amicus Curiae Electronic Privacy Information Center. Date of service: 10/21/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11472176] [17-16783] (Butler, Alan) [Entered: 10/21/2019 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) Filed (ECF) Appellant LinkedIn Corporation petition for panel rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc (from 09/09/2019 opinion). Date of service: 10/11/2019. [11462810] [17-16783] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 10/11/2019 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Eric A. Shumsky for Appellant LinkedIn Corporation. Date of service: 10/04/2017. [10604882] [17-16783] (Shumsky, Eric) [Entered: 10/04/2017 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of E. Joshua Rosenkranz for Appellant LinkedIn Corporation. Date of service: 10/04/2017. [10604875] [17-16783] (Rosenkranz, E.) [Entered: 10/04/2017 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant LinkedIn Corporation Motion to take judicial notice of Second Amended Complaint in case number 16 Civ. 4463-LHK-NC (N.D. Cal. Aug. 8, 2016), ECF No. 39. Date of service: 10/03/2017. [10604493] [17-16783] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 10/03/2017 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant LinkedIn Corporation. Date of service: 10/03/2017. [10604456] [17-16783] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 10/03/2017 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant LinkedIn Corporation. Date of service: 10/03/2017. [10604424] [17-16783] (Verrilli, Donald) [Entered: 10/03/2017 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Further Conference, 11/28/2017, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [10594798] (BS) [Entered: 09/26/2017 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 09/25/2017, 1:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [10582593] (BS) [Entered: 09/15/2017 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant LinkedIn Corporation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/11/2017. [10576771] [17-16783] (Blavin, Jonathan) [Entered: 09/11/2017 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: ME): The appeal filed September 5, 2017 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than October 3, 2017; the answering brief is due October 31, 2017 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). The parties are reminded that streamlined requests for extensions of time are not available in preliminary injunction appeals. See http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/content/view.php?pk_id=0000000638. Any request for an extension of time must be requested under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [10571779] (ME) [Entered: 09/06/2017 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction, C.R. 3-3 [10570561] (JBS) [Entered: 09/06/2017 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less