This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2021 at 06:10:21 (UTC).

Hills v. Arensdorf

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Hills filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Arensdorf. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3118

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

 

Party Details

Consolidated Plaintiff

BRENT HILLS

Plaintiff / Appellant

WENDY HILLS

Defendant / Appellee

GERARD ARENSDORF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam M. Hall

Attorney at Thompson-Hall

333 West Ninth Street, Suite B

Lawrence, KS 66044

Todd N. Thompson

Attorney at Thompson-Hall

333 West Ninth Street, Suite B

Lawrence, KS 66044

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kate Duncan Butler

Attorney at Barber Emerson

1211 Massachusetts Street, P.O. Box 667

Lawrence, KS 66044

Terrence J. Campbell

Attorney at Barber Emerson

1211 Massachusetts Street, P.O. Box 667

Lawrence, KS 66044

Matthew J. Rogers

Attorney at Barber Emerson, L.C.

1211 Massachusetts Street, P.O. Box 667

Lawrence, KS 66044

Catherine C. Theisen

Attorney at Barber Emerson, L.C.

1211 Massachusetts Street, P.O. Box 667

Lawrence, KS 66044

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Justice B. King

Attorney at Fisher Patterson Sayler & Smith

3550 Sw Fifth Street

Topeka, KS 66606

Blake K. Porter

Attorney at Fisher Patterson Sayler & Smith

3550 Sw Fifth Street

Topeka, KS 66606

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10846110] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/26/2021. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/07/2021 for Wendy Hills. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/26/2021 03:26 PM]

Open Document

[10844090] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 08/16/2021 for Kate Duncan Butler. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/15/2021 03:28 PM]

Open Document

[10843160] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justice B. King and Mr. Blake K. Porter for Gerard Arensdorf. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/12/2021 04:21 PM]

Open Document

[10843090] Entry of appearance filed by Kate Duncan Butler and Terrence J. Campbell for Wendy Hills. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 07/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/12/2021 02:56 PM]

Open Document

[10843075] Docketing statement filed by Wendy Hills. Served on 07/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3118] TJC [Entered: 07/12/2021 02:40 PM]

Open Document

[10842957] Transcript order form filed by Ms. Kelli Stewart and Transcript due 07/23/2021 for Kelli Stewart, Court Reporter. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/12/2021 12:32 PM]

Open Document

[10842617] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Wendy Hills. Transcript ordered: Motion to Dismiss Hearing held 5/25/2021. Served on: 07/09/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3118] TJC [Entered: 07/09/2021 12:43 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Preliminary Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • Docket[10847852] Attorney Ms. Kate Duncan Butler for Wendy Hills admitted to the bar of this court. [21-3118] [Entered: 08/03/2021 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10846780] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 08/10/2021 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-3118] [Entered: 07/28/2021 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10846110] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/26/2021. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/07/2021 for Wendy Hills. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/26/2021 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket[10845944] Minute order filed - The ordered transcript is on file in district court. Notice due that record is complete by 08/02/2021 for Timothy M. O'Brien (KStp), Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-3118] [Entered: 07/26/2021 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10844090] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 08/16/2021 for Kate Duncan Butler. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/15/2021 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10843160] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Justice B. King and Mr. Blake K. Porter for Gerard Arensdorf. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/12/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10843090] Entry of appearance filed by Kate Duncan Butler and Terrence J. Campbell for Wendy Hills. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (previously disclosed). Served on 07/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/12/2021 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docket[10843080] Entry of appearance submitted by Terrence J. Campbell, Kate Duncan Butler for Appellant Wendy Hills for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3118] --[Edited 07/12/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] TJC [Entered: 07/12/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10843075] Docketing statement filed by Wendy Hills. Served on 07/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3118] TJC [Entered: 07/12/2021 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10842957] Transcript order form filed by Ms. Kelli Stewart and Transcript due 07/23/2021 for Kelli Stewart, Court Reporter. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/12/2021 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docket[10842897] Entry of appearance submitted by Justice B. King and Blake K. Porter for Appellee Gerard Arensdorf for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/12/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3118]--[Edited 07/12/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 7/12/21.] JBK [Entered: 07/12/2021 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket[10842623] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 07/23/2021 for Kelli Stewart, Court Reporter (Motion to Dismiss Hearing held 5/25/2021). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-3118] [Entered: 07/09/2021 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10842617] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by Wendy Hills. Transcript ordered: Motion to Dismiss Hearing held 5/25/2021. Served on: 07/09/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3118] TJC [Entered: 07/09/2021 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10841559] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/06/2021. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 07/20/2021 for Wendy Hills. Notice of appearance due on 07/20/2021 for Gerard Arensdorf. [21-3118] [Entered: 07/06/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Benjamin King