This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/28/2019 at 06:01:57 (UTC).

Highlands Ranch Neighborhood v. Cater, et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 Highlands Ranch Neighborhood filed an Other lawsuit against Cater. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1190

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

COLORADO DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

JOHN M. CATER, in his official capacity as the Division Administrator, Colorado Division of the Federal Highway Administration

SHAILEN P. BHATT, in his official capacity as the Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Transportaion

FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION

SHOSHANNA LEW, in his official capacity as the Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Transportaion

Plaintiff / Appellant

HIGHLANDS RANCH NEIGHBORHOOD COALITION, a Colorado non-profit corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Leo F. Milan Jr.

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Andrew Mark Frohardt

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Evelyn S. Ying

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Ellen J. Durkee

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Marcy E. Cook

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David Warren Feeder II

Attorney at Feldmann Nagel

3858 Walnut Street, Suite 144

Denver, CO 80205

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10663840] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and Appendix to 09/13/2019 for Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition. [19-1190] [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:02 PM]

Open Document

[10663393] Attorney admission letter, second notice sent. Attorney admission response date set to 07/26/2019. [19-1190] [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:25 AM]

Open Document

[10657231] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief until 08/05/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 08/05/2019 for Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition. [19-1190] [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:28 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10655580] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 07/15/2019 for Leo F. Milan Jr.. [19-1190] [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:53 AM]

Open Document

[10655538] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 07/15/2019 for Andrew Mark Frohardt. [19-1190] [Entered: 06/13/2019 08:58 AM]

Open Document

[10655401] Entry of appearance filed by Leo F. Milan, Jr. and Andrew Mark Frohardt for Colorado Department of Transportation and Shoshanna Lew. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1190] [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:26 PM]

Open Document

[10655219] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Ellen J. Durkee and Ms. Evelyn S. Ying for Federal Highway Administration, and John M. Cater. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1190]--[Edited 06/12/2019 by LG to correct parties counsel represents] [Entered: 06/12/2019 08:51 AM]

Open Document

[10655174] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David Warren Feeder, II for Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/11/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1190] [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:43 AM]

Open Document

[10655131] Notice received from Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 06/11/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1190] DWF [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:47 PM]

Open Document

[10655108] Docketing statement filed by Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition. Served on 06/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1190] DWF [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:58 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Main Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663840] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and Appendix to 09/13/2019 for Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition. [19-1190] [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663393] Attorney admission letter, second notice sent. Attorney admission response date set to 07/26/2019. [19-1190] [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10657231] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief until 08/05/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 08/05/2019 for Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition. [19-1190] [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10657205] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 07/09/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-1190] [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • [10657229] Attorney Andrew Mark Frohardt for Colorado Department of Transportation and Shoshanna Lew admitted to the bar of this court. [19-1190] [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10655580] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 07/15/2019 for Leo F. Milan Jr.. [19-1190] [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10655538] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 07/15/2019 for Andrew Mark Frohardt. [19-1190] [Entered: 06/13/2019 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10655401] Entry of appearance filed by Leo F. Milan, Jr. and Andrew Mark Frohardt for Colorado Department of Transportation and Shoshanna Lew. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1190] [Entered: 06/12/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • [10655321] Entry of appearance submitted by Andy M. Frohardt for Appellees Colorado Department of Transportation and Shailen P. BhattShoshana M. Lew, as Successor to Shailen P. Bhatt for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [19-1190] --[Edited 06/12/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 6/12/2019.] AMF [Entered: 06/12/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10655219] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Ellen J. Durkee and Ms. Evelyn S. Ying for Federal Highway Administration, and John M. Cater. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1190]--[Edited 06/12/2019 by LG to correct parties counsel represents] [Entered: 06/12/2019 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • [10655213] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/12/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 07/22/2019 for Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition. Text entry only from district court NDA. [19-1190] [Entered: 06/12/2019 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • [10655211] Entry of appearance submitted by Evelyn S. Ying, Ellen J. Durkee for Appellees John M. Cater and Federal Highway Administration for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1190]--[Edited 06/12/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 6/12/2019] ESY [Entered: 06/12/2019 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10655174] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David Warren Feeder, II for Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/11/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1190] [Entered: 06/12/2019 06:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • [10655134] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 06/18/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1190] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10655131] Notice received from Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 06/11/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1190] DWF [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • [10655115] Entry of appearance submitted by David W. Feeder II for Appellant Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1190] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 06/12/2019 by NA] DWF [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10655108] Docketing statement filed by Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition. Served on 06/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1190] DWF [Entered: 06/11/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • [10651842] Notice of an NDA re-sent to Andrew Mark Frohardt. [19-1190] [Entered: 05/29/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10651832] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/29/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 06/12/2019 for Highlands Ranch Neighborhood Coalition. Notice of appearance due on 06/12/2019 for Shailen P. Bhatt, John M. Cater, Colorado Department of Transportation and Federal Highway Administration. [19-1190] [Entered: 05/29/2019 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Colorado Department of Transportation is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Highway Administration is a litigant