21-1020
01/20/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Other Real Property
THE HIGH LONESOME RANCH, LLC
THE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS FOR THE COUNTY OF GARFIELD
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, through its agency, the Bureau of Land Managment, a division of the United States Department of Interior
Ryan William Cooke
Sam D. Starritt
Frederick Richard Yarger
Christopher G. McAnany
Robyn W. Kube
Jon Tyler Burtard
Geoffrey P. Anderson
Tari L. Williams
Joshua D. McMahon
Katharine Anne Johnson
Ian Kellogg
Erika Kranz
Mediation Contact Form
Mediation Conference Notice
Exhibit A
Main Document
Exhibit 1
Exhibit 2 - Trial Transcript Excerpts
Exhibit 1 - Findings of Fact
Main Document
General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil
Main Document
Docket[10814620] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 03/30/2021 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-1020, 21-1055] [Entered: 03/12/2021 08:48 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10813674] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - cases 21-1020 and 21-1055 are procedurally consolidation. The parties are directed to confer and file a joint proposal addressing procedural consolidation of the briefing and appendix within 14 days. Response due on 03/23/2021 for The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Garfield, The High Lonesome Ranch, LLC and United States of America. Served on 03/09/2021. See order for details. [21-1020, 21-1055] [Entered: 03/09/2021 03:22 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10811058] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Erika Kranz for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/01/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1020] [Entered: 03/01/2021 09:31 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10811054] Entry of appearance submitted by Erika B. Kranz for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/01/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1020] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 03/01/2021 by NA] EK [Entered: 03/01/2021 09:26 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10807886] Transcript order form filed by Agren Blando Court Reporting. Transcript due 03/16/2021 for Agren Blando Court Reporting. [21-1020] [Entered: 02/16/2021 12:53 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10807596] Order filed by Judges Briscoe and Bacharach denying motion for stay filed by Appellant The High Lonesome Ranch, LLC. The emergency motion is denied as moot. Served on 02/12/2021. [21-1020] [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:04 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10807340] Upon review of the district court docket the transcript was filed by Terri Lindblom in district court on 02/10/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1020] [Entered: 02/12/2021 07:47 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10807339] Upon review of the district court docket the transcripts were filed by Ms. Sara Mitchell in district court on 02/08/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1020] [Entered: 02/12/2021 07:47 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10805686] Reply filed by The High Lonesome Ranch, LLC to Appellant's Motion to Stay Judgment Pending Appeal. Served on 02/05/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-1020] FRY [Entered: 02/05/2021 01:27 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10805183] Transcript order form filed by Ms. Sara Mitchell and Transcript due 02/09/2021 for Sara Mitchell. [21-1020] [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:35 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10804473] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Tari L. Williams for The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Garfield. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/01/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1020] [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:12 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10804464] Entry of appearance submitted by Tari L. Williams for Appellee The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Garfield for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/01/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1020]--[Edited 02/01/2021 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 2/1/2021.] TLW [Entered: 02/01/2021 03:03 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10804439] Response filed by The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Garfield to Appellee the Board Of County Commissioners tor the County of Garfield's Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay Judgment Pending Appeal and Emergency Motion for Limited Administrative Stay Pending Disposition of this Motion. Served on 02/01/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-1020] JDM [Entered: 02/01/2021 02:27 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10803753] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Geoffrey P. Anderson and Mr. Joshua D. McMahon for The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Garfield. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1020] [Entered: 01/28/2021 04:06 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10803740] Entry of appearance submitted by Joshua D. McMahon and Geoffrey P. Anderson for Appellee The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Garfield for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 01/28/2021 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [21-1020] JDM [Entered: 01/28/2021 03:42 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10801953] Order filed by Judges Briscoe and Bacharach - The Appellant has filed a motion for a stay of the district court's judgment pending appeal and for an emergency stay pending disposition of the motion to stay. We have determined that a response from the Board of County Commissioners for the County of Garfield ("the Board") would be beneficial in our resolution of this motion. The Board therefore is directed to respond to Appellant's motion on or before 02/01/2021. Appellant may file an optional reply on or before 02/05/2021. A temporary stay is granted and will be in effect until further order of the court. Served on 01/21/2021. [21-1020] [Entered: 01/21/2021 04:47 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10801493] Motion filed by Appellant The High Lonesome Ranch, LLC for stay of Judgment Pending Appeal and Emergency Motion for Limited Administrative Stay Pending Disposition of This Motion. Served on: 01/20/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-1020] FRY [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:44 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10801456] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Ryan William Cooke and Mr. Frederick Richard Yarger for The High Lonesome Ranch, LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (note, the interested parties listed have been previously disclosed). Served on 01/20/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1020] [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:07 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10801441] Entry of appearance submitted by Frederick R. Yarger, Ryan W. Cooke for Appellant The High Lonesome Ranch, LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/20/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1020] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 01/20/2021 by NA] FRY [Entered: 01/20/2021 02:37 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket[10801388] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/21/2021. Docketing statement due 02/03/2021 for The High Lonesome Ranch, LLC. Transcript order form due 02/03/2021 for The High Lonesome Ranch, LLC. Notice of appearance due on 02/03/2021 for The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Garfield, The High Lonesome Ranch, LLC and United States of America [21-1020] [Entered: 01/20/2021 01:06 PM]
[-] Read Less