This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/25/2022 at 05:16:44 (UTC).

Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co. v. K.Mizra LLC

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co filed an Other lawsuit against K Mizra LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1183

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

HEWLETT PACKARD ENTERPRISE CO.

Appellee

K.MIZRA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Manish Mehta

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff

71 S Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Appellee Attorney

Cliff Win II

Attorney at Folio Law Group PLLC

1200 Westlake Avenue N, Suite 809

Seattle, WA 98109

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/16/2022. [886309] Fee/IFP due on 12/07/2022. Entry of Appearance due 12/07/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/07/2022. Docketing Statement due 12/07/2022. Certified List due on 01/03/2023. [EKD] [Entered: 11/23/2022 09:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.Mizra LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HP INC., fka Hewlett-Packard Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cliff Win, Jr.