This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 06:01:05 (UTC).

Hetelkidis v. Saul

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Hetelkidis filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3744

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Sophie Hetelkidis

Syracuse, NY 13205

Defendant / Appellee

Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sophie Hetelkidis

122 West Seneca Turnpike, Apt. #313

Syracuse, NY 13205

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Elizabeth D. Rothstein

Attorney at United States Social Security Administration

26 Federal Plaza

New York, NY 10278

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#13

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

5 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/02/2020 unless Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis, submits Form D-P, FILED.[2724960] [19-3744] [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:43 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#12

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/02/2020 unless Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, FILED.[2724953] [19-3744] [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:36 AM]

5 #2

Certificate of Service

#19

(#19) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis MOTION, to extend time, [6] from the docket, FILED.[2749076] [19-3744] [Entered: 01/10/2020 11:11 AM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#11

(#11) ORDER, vacating previous order [ # 8 ] dated 12/10/2019, regarding fee default, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2725124] [19-3744] [Entered: 12/10/2019 10:07 AM]

#2

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/02/2020 unless Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[2724976] [19-3744] [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:47 AM]

#7

RESTRICTED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis MOTION, to extend time, [6] from the docket, FILED.[2749076] [19-3744] [Entered: 01/10/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by US mail.[2738708] [19-3744] [Entered: 12/27/2019 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Sophie Hetelkidis, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by US mail.[2738706] [19-3744] [Entered: 12/27/2019 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER, vacating previous order [ # 8 ] dated 12/10/2019, regarding fee default, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2725124] [19-3744] [Entered: 12/10/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/02/2020 unless Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, FILED.[2724976] [19-3744] [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/02/2020 unless Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis, submits Form D-P, FILED.[2724960] [19-3744] [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/02/2020 unless Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, FILED.[2724953] [19-3744] [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to extend time, [6], on behalf of Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis, FILED.[2717797] [19-3744] [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • (#6) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis, FILED. No Service.[2717796] [19-3744] [Entered: 11/27/2019 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Saul, FILED. Service date 11/21/2019 by US mail.[2712223] [19-3744] [Entered: 11/21/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2703977] [19-3744] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2703971] [19-3744] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2703969] [19-3744] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sophie Hetelkidis, FILED. [2703958] [19-3744] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.