This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/18/2022 at 06:08:44 (UTC).

Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. v. National Union Fire Insurance

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 Hertz Global Holdings, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Union Fire Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-853

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.

Defendant / Appellees

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh

U.S. Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Leslie C. Thorne Esq.

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Benjamin L. Mesches Esq.

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

2323 Victory Avenue

Dallas, TX 75219

David P. Bender Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

6000 Headquarters Drive

Plano, TX 75024

Marco A. Pulido

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

600 Anton Boulevard

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Alexander Seton Lorenzo Esq.

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Kelsey Kingsbery Esq.

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

4721 Emperor Boulevard

Durham, NC 27703

Scott Schwartz Esq.

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174

Joseph Anselm Bailey Esq. III

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#59

(#59) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, FILED. Service date 06/16/2022 by CM/ECF. [3333970] [22-853] [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:14 PM]

#58

(#58) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. Brief due date as 07/22/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 07/22/2022, FILED.[3318416] [22-853] [Entered: 05/19/2022 02:10 PM]

#55

(#55) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 07/22/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317855] [22-853] [Entered: 05/18/2022 08:02 PM]

#53

(#53) MOTION ORDER, granting Appellant's motion to remove appeal from the Expedited Appeals Calendar, [ # 48 ], filed by Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., by WJN, FILED. [3316095][53] [22-853] [Entered: 05/17/2022 09:00 AM]

#51

(#51) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/07/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3315587] [22-853] [Entered: 05/16/2022 12:41 PM]

#48

(#48) MOTION, for removal of appeal from the Expedited Appeals Calendar, on behalf of Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3314314] [22-853]--[Edited 05/13/2022 by EMC] [Entered: 05/12/2022 04:52 PM]

#46

(#46) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3314041] [22-853] [Entered: 05/12/2022 01:45 PM]

#44

(#45) ATTORNEY, David P. Bender Jr. for Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., in case 22-853, [ # 44 ], ADDED.[3313309] [22-853] [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:25 PM]

#42

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

#40

No Description Available

#39

No Description Available

#37

No Description Available

#33

No Description Available

#32

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ATTORNEY, Kelsey Kingsbery for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, in case 22-853, [ # 59 ], ADDED.[3334008] [22-853] [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, FILED. Service date 06/16/2022 by CM/ECF. [3333970] [22-853] [Entered: 06/16/2022 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. Brief due date as 07/22/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 07/22/2022, FILED.[3318416] [22-853] [Entered: 05/19/2022 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 07/22/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317855] [22-853] [Entered: 05/18/2022 08:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MOTION ORDER, granting Appellant's motion to remove appeal from the Expedited Appeals Calendar, [ # 48 ], filed by Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., by WJN, FILED. [3316095][53] [22-853] [Entered: 05/17/2022 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/07/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3315587] [22-853] [Entered: 05/16/2022 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION, for removal of appeal from the Expedited Appeals Calendar, on behalf of Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3314314] [22-853]--[Edited 05/13/2022 by EMC] [Entered: 05/12/2022 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ATTORNEY, Marco A. Pulido for Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., in case 22-853, [ # 46 ], ADDED.[3314065] [22-853] [Entered: 05/12/2022 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3314041] [22-853] [Entered: 05/12/2022 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ATTORNEY, David P. Bender Jr. for Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., in case 22-853, [ # 44 ], ADDED.[3313309] [22-853] [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 05/03/2022 by CM/ECF. [3308437] [22-853] [Entered: 05/03/2022 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Joseph A. Bailey Ill, [ # 11 ], in place of attorney Scott Schwartz, SUBSTITUTED.[3307808] [22-853] [Entered: 05/03/2022 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 05/03/2022 by CM/ECF. [3307738] [22-853] [Entered: 05/03/2022 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, FILED. Service date 05/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3307607] [22-853] [Entered: 05/02/2022 11:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3300143] [22-853] [Entered: 04/20/2022 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docket(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-26028884, FILED.[3300138] [22-853] [Entered: 04/20/2022 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/25/2022, RECEIVED.[3300137] [22-853] [Entered: 04/20/2022 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/30/2021, RECEIVED.[3300135] [22-853] [Entered: 04/20/2022 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/30/2021, RECEIVED.[3300133] [22-853] [Entered: 04/20/2022 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., FILED. [3300129] [22-853] [Entered: 04/20/2022 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ GLOBAL HOLDINGS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where U S Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander Seton Lorenzo