This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/02/2022 at 06:10:49 (UTC).

Herron v. New York City Transit

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 Herron filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against New York City Transit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-989

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Ronald Herron

Defendant / Appellees

New York City Transit

New York City Transit Department of Buses

Metropolitan Transportation Authority

MTA Bus Company

Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Marshall Benjamin Bellovin

Attorney at Ballon Stoll Bader & Nadler, P.C.

729 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Steve S. Efron Esq.

Attorney at Steve S. Efron, Esq.

257 West 35Th Street

New York, NY 10001

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Ronald Herron Brief due date as 08/09/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 08/09/2022, FILED.[3331136] [22-989] [Entered: 06/13/2022 08:51 AM]

#29

(#29) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, informing Court of proposed due date 08/09/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 06/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3330964] [22-989] [Entered: 06/10/2022 05:20 PM]

#27

(#27) NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3325009] [22-989] [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:40 PM]

#25

(#25) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/15/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3324593] [22-989] [Entered: 06/01/2022 12:54 PM]

#21

(#21) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED. Service date 06/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3324258] [22-989] [Entered: 06/01/2022 09:56 AM]

#20

(#20) ORDER, dated 05/18/2022, dismissing appeal by 06/01/2022, unless Appellant Ronald Herron, submits Form C, FILED.[3317537] [22-989] [Entered: 05/18/2022 02:22 PM]

#19

(#19) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Ronald Herron, Form C, [14], from the docket, FILED.[3317503] [22-989] [Entered: 05/18/2022 02:14 PM]

#16

(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [14], on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED.[3315078] [22-989] [Entered: 05/13/2022 04:33 PM]

#15

(#15) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by CM/ECF.[3314967] [22-989] [Entered: 05/13/2022 03:31 PM]

#13

(#13) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Ronald Herron, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [9], from the docket, FILED.[3313709] [22-989] [Entered: 05/12/2022 10:20 AM]

#10

(#10) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [9], on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED.[3311504] [22-989] [Entered: 05/09/2022 02:44 PM]

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED. Service date 05/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3311142] [22-989] [Entered: 05/09/2022 10:55 AM]

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, MTA Bus Company, New York City Transit and New York City Transit Department of Buses, FILED. Service date 05/06/2022 by CM/ECF.[3310606] [22-989] [Entered: 05/06/2022 11:41 AM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 04/05/2022, RECEIVED.[3309386] [22-989] [Entered: 05/04/2022 07:37 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Ronald Herron Brief due date as 08/09/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 08/09/2022, FILED.[3331136] [22-989] [Entered: 06/13/2022 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, informing Court of proposed due date 08/09/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 06/10/2022 by CM/ECF.[3330964] [22-989] [Entered: 06/10/2022 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[3325009] [22-989] [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/15/2022, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[3324593] [22-989] [Entered: 06/01/2022 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED. Service date 06/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3324258] [22-989] [Entered: 06/01/2022 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER, dated 05/18/2022, dismissing appeal by 06/01/2022, unless Appellant Ronald Herron, submits Form C, FILED.[3317537] [22-989] [Entered: 05/18/2022 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Ronald Herron, Form C, [14], from the docket, FILED.[3317503] [22-989] [Entered: 05/18/2022 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [14], on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED.[3315078] [22-989] [Entered: 05/13/2022 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by CM/ECF.[3314967] [22-989] [Entered: 05/13/2022 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docket(#14) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED. Service date 05/13/2022 by CM/ECF.[3314965] [22-989] [Entered: 05/13/2022 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Ronald Herron, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [9], from the docket, FILED.[3313709] [22-989] [Entered: 05/12/2022 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [9], on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED.[3311504] [22-989] [Entered: 05/09/2022 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED. Service date 05/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3311500] [22-989] [Entered: 05/09/2022 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED. Service date 05/09/2022 by CM/ECF.[3311142] [22-989] [Entered: 05/09/2022 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, MTA Bus Company, New York City Transit and New York City Transit Department of Buses, FILED. Service date 05/06/2022 by CM/ECF.[3310606] [22-989] [Entered: 05/06/2022 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3309388] [22-989] [Entered: 05/04/2022 07:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15528816, FILED.[3309387] [22-989] [Entered: 05/04/2022 07:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 04/05/2022, RECEIVED.[3309386] [22-989] [Entered: 05/04/2022 07:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ronald Herron, FILED. [3309385] [22-989] [Entered: 05/04/2022 07:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MTA Bus Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Manhattan and Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Metropolitan Transportation Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where New York City Office of Administrative Trials and Hearings is a litigant