This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/05/2021 at 06:04:41 (UTC).

Herbert v. CitiMortgage

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Herbert filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CitiMortgage. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-60079

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CitiMortgage, Incorporated, formerly known as CitiFinancial Mortgage Company, Incorporated

Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10

U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10

Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated

Citibank, N.A.

Plaintiff / Appellants

Nicholas E. Herbert

Mary D. McCaleb Herbert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert Thomas Schwartz

Attorney at Schwartz, Orgler & Jordan, P.L.L.C.

2355 Pass Road

Biloxi, MS 39531-0000

Christian Janet Strickland

Attorney at Schwartz, Orgler & Jordan, P.L.L.C.

2355 Pass Road

Biloxi, MS 39531-0000

Sheldon Givens Alston Esq.

Attorney at Brunini, Grantham, Grower & Hewes, P.L.L.C.

190 E. Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Jacob Arthur Bradley

Attorney at Brunini, Grantham, Grower & Hewes, P.L.L.C.

190 E. Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joel Lavelle Blackledge

Attorney at Blackledge Law Firm, P.A.

P.O. Box 8155

Gulfport, MS 39506

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #2

UNFILED Appearance Form

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Mr. Nicholas E. Herbert. Extension Granted to and including 04/26/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/26/2021, for Appellants Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Nicholas E. Herbert. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/22/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Mr. Nicholas E. Herbert for filing Appellant's Brief and Record Excerpts until 04/26/2021 [21-60079] (Joel Lavelle Blackledge ) [Entered: 03/22/2021 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joel Lavelle Blackledge for Appellants Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Nicholas E. Herbert in 21-60079. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/26/2021 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent due to address change for attorney Mr. Joel Lavelle Blackledge. A/Pet's Brief Due deadline updated to 04/07/2021, for Appellants Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Nicholas E. Herbert. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/26/2021 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60079] (Joel Lavelle Blackledge ) [Entered: 02/25/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Appearance Form received 02/25/2021, from attorney Mr. Joel Lavelle Blackledge, on behalf of Appellants Mr. Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Mr. Nicholas E. Herbert, because the wrong docket event of "Signed Notice of Appeal Filed" was used to file the appearance form. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/25/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert Thomas Schwartz for Appellees Citibank, N.A. and CitiMortgage, Incorporated in 21-60079. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/19/2021 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Thomas Schwartz for Citibank, N.A. and CitiMortgage, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60079] (Robert Thomas Schwartz ) [Entered: 02/18/2021 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Mr. Robert Thomas Schwartz for Appellees Citibank, N.A. and CitiMortgage, Incorporated is advised to resubmit appearance form to include office address. [21-60079] (LBM) [Entered: 02/18/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/30/2021 for Appellants Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Nicholas E. Herbert. [21-60079] (CMB) [Entered: 02/18/2021 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60079] (Robert Thomas Schwartz ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 05:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jacob Arthur Bradley for Appellees Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated; Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10; and U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10, in case 21-60079. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-60079] (Jacob Arthur Bradley ) [Entered: 02/17/2021 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christian Janet Strickland for party(s) Appellee Citibank, N.A. Appellee CitiMortgage, Incorporated, in case 21-60079 [21-60079] (CB) [Entered: 02/15/2021 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-60079] (Christian Janet Strickland ) [Entered: 02/12/2021 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Sheldon Givens Alston for Appellees U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10; Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10; and Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated in 21-60079. [21-60079] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/12/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Sheldon Givens Alston, Esq. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated, Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10 and U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2018-PM10 for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-60079] (Sheldon Givens Alston ) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:19-CV-646. Electronic ROA due on 02/26/2021. [21-60079] (MAS) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9502929-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-60079] (MAS) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Mary D. McCaleb Herbert and Mr. Nicholas E. Herbert [21-60079] (MAS) [Entered: 02/04/2021 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOWD POINT MASTER FUNDING TRUST 2019-PM7 is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant