This case was last updated from PACER on 04/29/2020 at 05:10:33 (UTC).

Hera Wireless S.A. v. Ruckus Wireless, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Hera Wireless S A filed an Other lawsuit against Ruckus Wireless, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1737

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

SISVEL UK LIMITED

HERA WIRELESS S.A.

Appellees

NETGEAR, INC.

ROKU, INC.

BELKIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.

AMAZON.COM, INC.

RUCKUS WIRELESS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Appellee Attorney

Christopher Joseph Tyson

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

505 9Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/20/2020. [689990] Entry of Appearance is due 05/11/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/11/2020. Docketing Statement is due 05/11/2020. Certified List is due on 06/08/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 04/27/2020 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SISVEL UK LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where RUCKUS WIRELESS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Roku, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BELKIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant