This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/22/2020 at 05:53:43 (UTC).

Hera Wireless S.A. v. Intel Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Hera Wireless S A filed an Other lawsuit against Intel Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2004

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

SISVEL UK LIMITED

HERA WIRELESS S.A.

Appellee

INTEL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Appellee Attorney

Tyler R. Bowen

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

2901 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Hera Wireless S.A. and Sisvel UK Limited. Service: 07/20/2020 by email. [708676] [20-2004] [Timothy Devlin] [Entered: 07/20/2020 05:28 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Hera Wireless S.A. and Sisvel UK Limited. Service: 07/20/2020 by email. [708673] [20-2004] [Timothy Devlin] [Entered: 07/20/2020 05:26 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Timothy Devlin (principal counsel) as counsel for Appellants Hera Wireless S.A. and Sisvel UK Limited. Service: 07/20/2020 by email. [708670] [20-2004] [Timothy Devlin] [Entered: 07/20/2020 05:23 PM]

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Hera Wireless S.A. and Sisvel UK Limited. Service: 07/20/2020 by email. [708676] [20-2004] [Timothy Devlin] [Entered: 07/20/2020 05:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Hera Wireless S.A. and Sisvel UK Limited. Service: 07/20/2020 by email. [708673] [20-2004] [Timothy Devlin] [Entered: 07/20/2020 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Timothy Devlin (principal counsel) as counsel for Appellants Hera Wireless S.A. and Sisvel UK Limited. Service: 07/20/2020 by email. [708670] [20-2004] [Timothy Devlin] [Entered: 07/20/2020 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/14/2020. [708490] Entry of Appearance is due on 08/03/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 08/03/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 08/03/2020. Certified List is due on 08/31/2020. [EKD] [Entered: 07/20/2020 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SISVEL UK LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where Intel Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Devlin