This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/06/2020 at 05:10:01 (UTC).

Hera Wireless S.A. v. Intel Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 Hera Wireless S A filed an Other lawsuit against Intel Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1766

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

SISVEL UK LIMITED

HERA WIRELESS S.A.

Appellee

INTEL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Appellee Attorney

Tyler R. Bowen

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

2901 N Central Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/27/2020. [691897] Entry of Appearance is due 05/18/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/18/2020. Docketing Statement is due 05/18/2020. Certified List is due on 06/15/2020. [LMN] [Entered: 05/04/2020 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SISVEL UK LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where Intel Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Devlin