This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2019 at 06:05:59 (UTC).

Henry v. Fernandez-Rundle

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Henry filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Fernandez-Rundle. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1391

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

KATHERINE FERNANDEZ-RUNDLE

Plaintiff / Appellant

SHAWN MARCOS HENRY

Miami, FL 33127

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Shawn Marcos Henry

500 Nw 42Nd Street

Miami, FL 33127

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER filed. This matter and all filings are transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. (Per Curiam). Service: 02/19/2019 by clerk. [586858] [LS] [Entered: 02/19/2019 10:13 AM]

#14

(#14) INFORMAL BRIEF FILED for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Number of Pages: 2. Service: 02/05/2019 by clerk. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [583430] [SMJ] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:14 AM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Reinsurance Agreement form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581047] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:20 PM]

#9

(#9) Reinsurance Agreement form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581044] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:17 PM]

#8

(#8) Performance Bond form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581038] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:14 PM]

#7

(#7) Copy of 12/18/18 district court dimissal order for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581034] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:12 PM]

#6

(#6) Bid Bond form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581031] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:10 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581024] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:04 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581023] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:02 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Shawn Marcos Henry as pro se Appellant. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581017] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:58 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER filed. This matter and all filings are transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. (Per Curiam). Service: 02/19/2019 by clerk. [586858] [LS] [Entered: 02/19/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) INFORMAL BRIEF FILED for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Number of Pages: 2. Service: 02/05/2019 by clerk. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [583430] [SMJ] [Entered: 02/05/2019 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Reinsurance Agreement form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581056] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Release of Personal Property from Escrow form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581054] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Release of Lien on Real Property form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581048] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Reinsurance Agreement form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581047] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Reinsurance Agreement form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581044] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Performance Bond form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581038] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Copy of 12/18/18 district court dimissal order for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581034] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Bid Bond form for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581031] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Affidavit of Individual Surety for Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581029] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581024] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Shawn Marcos Henry. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581023] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Shawn Marcos Henry as pro se Appellant. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [581017] [SMJ] [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/04/2019. [577084] Entry of Appearance due 01/23/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/23/2019. Appellant/Petitioner's Informal brief is due 01/30/2019. [SMJ] [Entered: 01/09/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.