This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2019 at 06:05:59 (UTC).

Henry Hartshorn v. Michael Sievert, et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Henry Hartshorn filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Michael Sievert. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1283

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CHRIS LESPERANCE

DANIEL BEAUCHAMP

BARRY DEGNITZ

LANCE A. LINCOLN

MICHAEL SIEVERT

Plaintiff / Appellant

HENRY W. HARTSHORN

Green Bay, WI 54307-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Andrew P. Smith

Attorney at MALLERY & ZIMMERMAN

8-A W. Davenport Street, P.O. Box 841

Rhinelander, WI 54501

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Henry W. Hartshorn

Attorney at GREEN BAY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 19033

Green Bay, WI 54307-0000

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

4 #2

Motion for IFP to Transfer to DC

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Notice to District Court

4 #1

PLRA Order

#5

(#5) Filed district court order dated 03/01/2019: Directing Henry W Hartshorn to file his six-month certified trust account statement on or before 3/8/2019. Failure to submit the trust account statement by that date will result in denial of his [80] Motion for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. [5] [6988279] [19-1283] (CCG) [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:08 AM]

6 #2

PLRA Fee Notice AC

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

#1

Civil Rights Case

6 #1

PLRA D.C. Denial of IFP

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Henry W. Hartshorn leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 03/19/2019. [6] [6991718] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 04/18/2019 [19-1283] (CCG) [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filed district court order dated 03/01/2019: Directing Henry W Hartshorn to file his six-month certified trust account statement on or before 3/8/2019. Failure to submit the trust account statement by that date will result in denial of his [80] Motion for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. [5] [6988279] [19-1283] (CCG) [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [4] [6987618] [19-1283] (MM) [Entered: 02/28/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Henry W. Hartshorn to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [3] [6987525] [19-1283] (PS) [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • (#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Steven Schmidt [2] [6984875] [19-1283] (AP) [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Henry W. Hartshorn by 02/20/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 03/18/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 03/01/2019. [1] [6984869] [19-1283] (AP) [Entered: 02/15/2019 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.