This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:38 (UTC).

Henry Brown v. Randee Rewerts

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Henry Brown filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Randee Rewerts. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1771

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

RANDEE REWERTS

Petitioner / Appellant

HENRY BROWN

Carson City, MI 48811

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

John S. Pallas

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General

P.O. Box 30217

Lansing, MI 48909

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Henry Brown

Attorney at Carson City Correctional Facility

10274 Boyer Road

Carson City, MI 48811

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Appellant MOTION filed by Henry Brown to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 07/29/2019. (BSM) [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:53 AM]

#1

Case Opening Letter

#6

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Appellant MOTION filed by Henry Brown for expansion of certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 08/26/2019. (BSM) [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:01 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) CORRESPONDENCE: cover letter to following entries by Henry Brown. (BSM) [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:50 AM]

1 #2

(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. R#21 filed 06/20/2019. Notice filed by Appellant Henry Brown. Transcript needed: n. (BSM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:04 PM]

#4

(#4) Appellant MOTION filed by to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 07/29/2019. (BSM) [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:51 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Appellant MOTION filed by Henry Brown for expansion of certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 08/26/2019. (BSM) [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Appellant MOTION filed by Henry Brown to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 07/29/2019. (BSM) [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Prisoner trust account statement filed. (BSM) [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Financial Affidavit filed by Party Henry Brown Certificate of Service: 07/29/2019. (BSM) [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Appellant MOTION filed by to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 07/29/2019. (BSM) [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORRESPONDENCE: cover letter to following entries by Henry Brown. (BSM) [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Briston Mitchell (BSM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. R#21 filed 06/20/2019. Notice filed by Appellant Henry Brown. Transcript needed: n. (BSM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.