This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2020 at 06:06:12 (UTC).

Henry-Bey v. Castro

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 Henry-Bey filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Castro. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1125

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC

BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOANS

MAXIM PROPERTIES

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendant / Appellees

SHERWOOD LAKES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

HECTOR CASTRO

CARMELA BAUTISA

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL A. HENRY-BEY, fka Michael Anthony Henry

Riviera Beach, FL 33419-1774

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Agnieszka Natalia Chiapperini

Attorney at Broad And Cassel

One Financial Plaza, Suite 2700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Peter Morris Armold

Attorney at Gary, Dytrych & Ryan P.A.

701 Us Highway 1, Suite 402

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michael A. Henry-Bey

Po Box 11774

Riviera Beach, FL 33419-1774

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RESPONSE of Appellant Michael A. Henry-Bey to the court order to show cause [ # 10 ] ,court order to stay appeal [ # 10 ] ,court order [ # 10 ]. Service: 12/19/2019 by email, US mail. [659605] [MMA] [Entered: 12/30/2019 05:33 PM]

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER filed directing parties to show cause, within 30 days of the date of filing of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed or transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. The briefing schedule is stayed. Appellants motion for an extension of time to file his opening brief [ # 9 ] is denied as moot. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [656433] [NL] [Entered: 12/13/2019 11:27 AM]

#9

(#9) MOTION of Appellant Michael A. Henry-Bey to extend the time by 30 additional days to file the Informal Opening Brief. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 12/12/2019 by clerk. [656126] [MMA] [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:18 PM]

#8

(#8) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Carmela Bautisa and Hector Castro. Service: 11/21/2019 by email, US mail. [651242] [20-1125] [Peter Armold] [Entered: 11/21/2019 12:10 PM]

#7

(#7) Corrected Entry of appearance for Peter M. Armold as principal counsel for Appellees Carmela Bautisa and Hector Castro. Service: 11/21/2019 by email, US mail. [651241] [20-1125] [Peter Armold] [Entered: 11/21/2019 12:07 PM]

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Carmela Bautisa and Hector Castro, Entry of Appearance - P. Armold; Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 12/02/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [651131] [MMA] [Entered: 11/21/2019 09:15 AM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for. Service: 11/19/2019 by email. [650524] [20-1125] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 6 ] [Peter Armold] [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:48 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Peter M. Armold, Esq as principal counsel for. Service: 11/19/2019 by email. [650523] [20-1125] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 6 ] [Peter Armold] [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:46 PM]

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Copy of Notice of Appeal from Appellant Michael A. Henry-Bey. Service: 11/08/2019 by clerk. [648111] [MMA] [Entered: 11/08/2019 12:24 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE of Appellant Michael A. Henry-Bey to the court order to show cause [ # 10 ] ,court order to stay appeal [ # 10 ] ,court order [ # 10 ]. Service: 12/19/2019 by email, US mail. [659605] [MMA] [Entered: 12/30/2019 05:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION of Appellant Michael A. Henry-Bey for leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis. Service: 12/10/2019 by US mail. [657201] [MMA] [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER filed directing parties to show cause, within 30 days of the date of filing of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed or transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. The briefing schedule is stayed. Appellants motion for an extension of time to file his opening brief [ # 9 ] is denied as moot. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [656433] [NL] [Entered: 12/13/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION of Appellant Michael A. Henry-Bey to extend the time by 30 additional days to file the Informal Opening Brief. [Consent: not addressed]. Service: 12/12/2019 by clerk. [656126] [MMA] [Entered: 12/12/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Carmela Bautisa and Hector Castro. Service: 11/21/2019 by email, US mail. [651242] [20-1125] [Peter Armold] [Entered: 11/21/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corrected Entry of appearance for Peter M. Armold as principal counsel for Appellees Carmela Bautisa and Hector Castro. Service: 11/21/2019 by email, US mail. [651241] [20-1125] [Peter Armold] [Entered: 11/21/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Carmela Bautisa and Hector Castro, Entry of Appearance - P. Armold; Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], [ # 5 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 12/02/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [651131] [MMA] [Entered: 11/21/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for. Service: 11/19/2019 by email. [650524] [20-1125] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 6 ] [Peter Armold] [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Peter M. Armold, Esq as principal counsel for. Service: 11/19/2019 by email. [650523] [20-1125] This document is non-compliant. See Doc. No. [ # 6 ] [Peter Armold] [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION of Appellant Michael A. Henry-Bey for leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis. Service: 11/04/2019 by US mail. [648113] [MMA] [Entered: 11/08/2019 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Copy of Notice of Appeal from Appellant Michael A. Henry-Bey. Service: 11/08/2019 by clerk. [648111] [MMA] [Entered: 11/08/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/04/2019. [647230] Fee/IFP due on 11/20/2019. Entry of Appearance due 11/20/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 11/20/2019. Appellant's Informal brief is due 12/02/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 11/06/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less