This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2019 at 06:02:20 (UTC).

Helen Youngblood v. Bd of Comm of Mahoning Cnty, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Helen Youngblood filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bd of Comm of Mahoning Cnty. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3877

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ANTHONY TRAFICANTI

MAHONING COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF JOB AND FAMILY SERVICES

ROBERT E. BUSH, JR., Director Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services

DAVID C. DITZLER

BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS OF MAHONING COUNTY, OHIO

CAROL RIMEDIO-RIGHETTI

MELISSA WASKO, Program Administrator Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services

Plaintiff / Appellant

HELEN YOUNGBLOOD, Individually and as a putative class representative

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk

Attorney at Office of the Prosecuting Attorney

21 West Boardman Street, 6Th Floor

Youngstown, OH 44503-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Percy Squire

Attorney at Law Office

341 S. Third Street, Suite 10

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 13 days [ # 14 ] filed by Mr. Percy Squire. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/25/2019. Appellee brief now due 12/26/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 11/13/2019 08:55 AM]

#14

(#14) MOTION filed by Mr. Percy Squire for Helen Youngblood to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/12/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 05:19 PM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/12/2019; appellee brief due 12/11/2019 (MMP) [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:48 PM]

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Percy Squire for Appellant Helen Youngblood Certificate of Service: 09/26/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:00 PM]

#9

(#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Percy Squire for Appellant Helen Youngblood. Certificate of Service:09/26/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:59 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Helen Youngblood by Percy Squire. Certificate of Service: 09/26/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:58 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Board of Commissioners of Mahoning County, Ohio, Robert E. Bush, Jr., David C. Ditzler, Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services, Carol Rimedio-Righetti, Anthony Traficanti and Melissa Wasko by Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk. Certificate of Service: 09/20/2019. [19-3877] (GDZ) [Entered: 09/20/2019 01:44 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 10/17/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:57 AM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/10/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:32 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Helen Youngblood. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:52 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 13 days [ # 14 ] filed by Mr. Percy Squire. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/25/2019. Appellee brief now due 12/26/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 11/13/2019 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION filed by Mr. Percy Squire for Helen Youngblood to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/12/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ***LOCKED - AN ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE IS REQUIRED. COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE THE MOTION WITH AN ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE*** MOTION filed by Mr. Percy Squire for Helen Youngblood to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 11/11/2019. [19-3877]--[Edited 11/12/2019 by MMP] (PS) [Entered: 11/11/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • (#12) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 10/18/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 11/12/2019; appellee brief due 12/11/2019 (MMP) [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Percy Squire for Appellant Helen Youngblood Certificate of Service: 09/26/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Percy Squire for Appellant Helen Youngblood. Certificate of Service:09/26/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Helen Youngblood by Percy Squire. Certificate of Service: 09/26/2019. [19-3877] (PS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Board of Commissioners of Mahoning County, Ohio, Robert E. Bush, Jr., David C. Ditzler, Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services, Carol Rimedio-Righetti, Anthony Traficanti and Melissa Wasko by Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk. Certificate of Service: 09/20/2019. [19-3877] (GDZ) [Entered: 09/20/2019 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 10/17/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***LOCKED - THE APPEARANCE FORM IS BLANK. PLEASE COMPLETE THE FORM AND REFILE*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Board of Commissioners of Mahoning County, Ohio, Robert E. Bush, Jr., David C. Ditzler, Mahoning County Department of Job and Family Services, Carol Rimedio-Righetti, Anthony Traficanti and Melissa Wasko by Gina DeGenova Zawrotuk. Certificate of Service: 09/19/2019. [19-3877]--[Edited 09/20/2019 by MMP] (GDZ) [Entered: 09/19/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATOR INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/10/2019 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • (#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 09/17/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Helen Youngblood. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 09/16/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.