This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2019 at 06:08:13 (UTC).

Heidgen v. Graham

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 Heidgen filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Graham. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-266

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellees

N.Y.S. DOCCS

Harold Graham, Superintendent Auburn Correctional Facility

Petitioner / Appellant

Martin Heidgen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Judith R. Sternberg Esq.

Attorney at Nassau County District Attorney's Office

262 Old Country Road

Mineola, NY 11501

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Jillian S. Harrington

Attorney at Law Office of Jillian S. Harrington

P.O. Box 6006

Monroe Township, NJ 08831

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2484559] [19-266] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:59 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/22/2019, denying certificate of appealability, RECEIVED.[2484562] [19-266] [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:00 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#6

(#8) CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel [ # 6 ], [ # 7 ], on behalf of Appellee Harold Graham and N.Y.S. DOCCS, FILED.[2488805] [19-266] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:52 PM]

#7

(#9) ATTORNEY, Judith R. Sternberg, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Robert F. Van Der Waag, SUBSTITUTED.[2488807] [19-266] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:53 PM]

#36

(#36) MOTION ORDER, granting the motion for an extension of time to file a motion for certificate of appealability by April 19, 2019 [ # 32 ] filed by Appellant Martin Heidgen, by CFD, FILED. [2527444][36] [19-266] [Entered: 03/28/2019 09:34 AM]

32 #2

Supporting Document

32 #1

T1080

#30

(#30) MOTION ORDER, granting the motion for leave to file an oversized motion for a certificate of appealability and for an extension until 03/19/2019 to file the motion, [ # 21 ] [ # 21 ] filed by Appellant Martin Heidgen, by CFD, FILED. [2506116][30] [19-266] [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:59 AM]

21 #2

Supporting Document - Affirmation

21 #1

Motion FILED

23 #2

Affirmation in Support

23 #1

T1080 Form

23 #3

Exhibt A - Financial Affidavit

#27

(#27) MOTION ORDER, deferring motion for appointment of CJA counsel [ # 23 ] filed by Appellant Martin Heidgen, FILED. [2504598][27] [19-266] [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:55 PM]

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MOTION ORDER, granting the motion for an extension of time to file a motion for certificate of appealability by April 19, 2019 [ # 32 ] filed by Appellant Martin Heidgen, by CFD, FILED. [2527444][36] [19-266] [Entered: 03/28/2019 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Martin Heidgen, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2522117] [19-266] [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION ORDER, granting the motion for leave to file an oversized motion for a certificate of appealability and for an extension until 03/19/2019 to file the motion, [ # 21 ] [ # 21 ] filed by Appellant Martin Heidgen, by CFD, FILED. [2506116][30] [19-266] [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION ORDER, deferring motion for appointment of CJA counsel [ # 23 ] filed by Appellant Martin Heidgen, FILED. [2504598][27] [19-266] [Entered: 02/25/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION, for appointment of CJA counsel, on behalf of Appellant Martin Heidgen, FILED. Service date 02/25/2019 by CM/ECF. [2504100] [19-266] [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION, to file oversized certificate of appealability, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Martin Heidgen, FILED. Service date 02/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2501619] [19-266] [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Martin Heidgen, FILED. Service date 02/19/2019 by CM/ECF.[2499923] [19-266] [Entered: 02/19/2019 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Martin Heidgen Motion, for appointment of CJA counsel, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [10], [13], [15] from the docket, FILED.[2499891] [19-266] [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [15], on behalf of Appellant Martin Heidgen, FILED.[2495841] [19-266] [Entered: 02/13/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • (#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Martin Heidgen, FILED. Service date 02/13/2018 by CM/ECF.[2495782] [19-266] [Entered: 02/13/2019 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • (#10) MOTION, for appointment of CJA counsel, on behalf of Appellant Martin Heidgen, FILED. Service date 02/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2495497] [19-266] [Entered: 02/13/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY, Judith R. Sternberg, [ # 7 ], in place of attorney Robert F. Van Der Waag, SUBSTITUTED.[2488807] [19-266] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel [ # 6 ], [ # 7 ], on behalf of Appellee Harold Graham and N.Y.S. DOCCS, FILED.[2488805] [19-266] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harold Graham and N.Y.S. DOCCS, FILED. Service date 02/04/2019 by CM/ECF. [2488767] [19-266] [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitue Counsel, [5], on behalf of Appellee Harold Graham, FILED.[2488445] [19-266] [Entered: 02/04/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harold Graham, FILED. Service date 02/04/2019 by CM/ECF. [2488328] [19-266] [Entered: 02/04/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2485148] [19-266] [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/22/2019, denying certificate of appealability, RECEIVED.[2484562] [19-266] [Entered: 01/29/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2484559] [19-266] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Martin Heidgen, FILED. [2484552] [19-266] [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.