This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:11 (UTC).

Hector Hernandez v. Plastipak Packaging, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Hector Hernandez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Plastipak Packaging, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12655

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

HECTOR HERNANDEZ, on his own behalf and on behalf of those similarly situated

Defendant / Appellant

PLASTIPAK PACKAGING, INC., a Foreign Profit Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kimberly De Arcangelis

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

20 N Orange Ave Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Andrew R. Frisch

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

8151 Peters Rd Ste 4000

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Thomas M. Gonzalez

Attorney at GrayRobinson, PA

401 E Jackson St Ste 2700

Tampa, FL 33602

Ronald G. Acho

Attorney at Cummings McClorey Davis & Acho, PLC

17436 College Pkwy

Livonia, MI 48152

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Thomas M. Gonzalez for Appellant Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. [19-12655] (ECF: Thomas Gonzalez) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document

AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly De Arcangelis for Appellee Hector Hernandez. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12655] (ECF: Kimberly De Arcangelis) [Entered: 08/27/2019 03:27 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Thomas M. Gonzalez for Appellant Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12655] (ECF: Thomas Gonzalez) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:12 PM]

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DE #62 Order

Open Document #4

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ronald G. Acho for Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. [19-12655] (ECF: Ronald Acho) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:56 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Andrew R. Frisch for Appellee Hector Hernandez. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12655] (ECF: Andrew Frisch) [Entered: 08/01/2019 05:03 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: The motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Ronald G. Acho is GRANTED. (CK) [8834623-2] [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:25 PM]

Open Document #2

DE #66 Judgment

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas M. Gonzalez for Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. [19-12655] (ECF: Thomas Gonzalez) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:51 PM]

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 09/25/2019 filed by Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. Motion is Unopposed. [8849482-1] [19-12655] (ECF: Ronald Acho) [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:53 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly De Arcangelis for Hector Hernandez. [19-12655] (ECF: Charles Morgan) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:47 PM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kimberly De Arcangelis for Appellee Hector Hernandez. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12655] (ECF: Kimberly De Arcangelis) [Entered: 08/27/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kimberly De Arcangelis for Hector Hernandez. [19-12655] (ECF: Charles Morgan) [Entered: 08/19/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Plastipak Packaging, Inc. is GRANTED. [ # 8849482-2 ] Appellants brief due on 09/25/2019, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. CRW [Entered: 08/14/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 09/25/2019 filed by Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. Motion is Unopposed. [8849482-1] [19-12655] (ECF: Ronald Acho) [Entered: 08/09/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Andrew R. Frisch for Appellee Hector Hernandez. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12655] (ECF: Andrew Frisch) [Entered: 08/01/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Thomas M. Gonzalez for Appellant Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12655] (ECF: Thomas Gonzalez) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Ronald G. Acho for Plastipak Packaging, Inc. and Thomas M. Gonzalez for Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ronald G. Acho for Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. [19-12655] (ECF: Ronald Acho) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Thomas M. Gonzalez for Appellant Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. [19-12655] (ECF: Thomas Gonzalez) [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: The motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Ronald G. Acho is GRANTED. (CK) [8834623-2] [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Ronald G. Acho for Appellant Plastipak Packaging, Inc. [8834623-1] [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas M. Gonzalez for Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. [19-12655] (ECF: Thomas Gonzalez) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Plastipak Packaging, Inc. on 07/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/26/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/29/2019 as to Appellant Plastipak Packaging, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/12/2019 as to Appellee Hector Hernandez [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.