This case was last updated from PACER on 03/25/2019 at 06:07:38 (UTC).

Heather Hoffman v. P. Tanner

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Heather Hoffman filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against P Tanner. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1095

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

J. EDWARD ALLEN, Beaufort County Coroner

ERIC CALENDINE

P. J. TANNER, Beaufort County Sheriff

JERRI ANN ROSENEAU, Beaufort County Magistrate Court Clerk of Court

CATHERINE E. HEIGEL, Director, SC Department of Health and Environmental Control

MICHAEL HATFIELD

STEPHANIE SMART-GITTINGS, Circuit Defender, Beaufort County Public Defender's Office

AT&T

SUSAN ERIN PRESNELL, MUSC Medical Examiner

ANDREW CALORE

DUFFIE STONE, Fourteenth Circuit Court Solicitor

Plaintiff / Appellant

HEATHER C. HOFFMAN

Hilton Head Island, SC 29926

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Mary Bass Lohr Esq.

Attorney at HOWELL, GIBSON & HUGHES, PA

P. O. Box 40

Beaufort, SC 29901-0040

Elloree Ann Ganes

Attorney at HOOD LAW FIRM

172 Meeting Street, P. O. Box 1508

Charleston, SC 29402-0000

Barbara Wynne Showers

Attorney at HOOD LAW FIRM

172 Meeting Street, P. O. Box 1508

Charleston, SC 29402-0000

Hervery B. O. Young

Attorney at SOUTH CAROLINA COMMISSION ON INDIGENT DEFENSE

P. O. Box 11433

Columbia, SC 29211-1433

Andrew Richard Hand

Attorney at WILLOUGHBY & HOEFER, PA

P. O. Box 8416

Columbia, SC 29202-8416

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Heather C. Hoffman

305 Marsh Point Drive

Hilton Head Island, SC 29926

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Hervery Young for Stephanie Smart-Gittings. [1000460238] [19-1095] Hervery Young [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:23 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by J. Edward Allen, Eric Calendine, Andrew Calore, Michael Hatfield, Jerri Ann Roseneau, Duffie Stone and P. J. Tanner. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000454473] [19-1095] Mary Lohr [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:34 AM]

5 #1

Document

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary Bass Lohr for J. Edward Allen, Eric Calendine, Andrew Calore, Michael Hatfield, Jerri Ann Roseneau, Duffie Stone and P. J. Tanner. [1000454471] [19-1095] Mary Lohr [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:33 AM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew R. Hand for AT&T. [1000466522] [19-1095] Andrew Hand [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:24 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [1000454409] [19-1095] Elloree Ganes [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:50 AM]

#4

(#4) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Heather Hoffman, William Britt, Andrew Hand, Hervery Young. Informal Opening Brief due 02/19/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1095] CB [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:33 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [1000454557] [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:53 PM]

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ms. Catherine E. Heigel. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000454559] [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:55 PM]

5 #2

envelope

13 #2

envelope

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:18-cv-01146-RMG-BM. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1095] CB [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:45 PM]

#16

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000454561] [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:57 PM]

#15

(#15) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by AT&T. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000466528] [19-1095] Andrew Hand [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:29 PM]

13 #1

Informal opening brief (pro se cases, no paper copies required)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) INFORMAL RESPONSE BRIEF by Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MEMORANDUM RESPONSE BRIEF by Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [19-1095]--[Edited 03/05/2019 by CB - See Informal Response Brief at ECF 17.] Barbara Showers [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by AT&T. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000466528] [19-1095] Andrew Hand [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew R. Hand for AT&T. [1000466522] [19-1095] Andrew Hand [Entered: 02/27/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Heather C. Hoffman. [19-1095] CB [Entered: 02/21/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Hervery Young for Stephanie Smart-Gittings. [1000460238] [19-1095] Hervery Young [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000454561] [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Ms. Catherine E. Heigel. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000454559] [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [1000454557] [19-1095] Barbara Showers [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by J. Edward Allen, Eric Calendine, Andrew Calore, Michael Hatfield, Jerri Ann Roseneau, Duffie Stone and P. J. Tanner. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000454473] [19-1095] Mary Lohr [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mary Bass Lohr for J. Edward Allen, Eric Calendine, Andrew Calore, Michael Hatfield, Jerri Ann Roseneau, Duffie Stone and P. J. Tanner. [1000454471] [19-1095] Mary Lohr [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Ms. Catherine E. Heigel and Dr. Susan Erin Presnell. [1000454409] [19-1095] Elloree Ganes [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCUMENT - copy of Notice of Appeal by Heather C. Hoffman. [1000447083] [19-1095] CB [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Heather Hoffman, William Britt, Andrew Hand, Hervery Young. Informal Opening Brief due 02/19/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [19-1095] CB [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • (#3) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 9:18-cv-01146-RMG-BM. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-1095] CB [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:18-cv-01146-RMG-BM. Case manager: CBennett. [19-1095] CB [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.