This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 06:07:19 (UTC).

Heard v. Dulayev, et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Heard filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dulayev. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1461

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

GREG DULAYEV

CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, a municipality

GREG DULAYEV, individually

Plaintiff / Appellee

GREGORY HEARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Melanie Lewis

Attorney at Office of the Denver City Attorney

201 West Colfax Avenue, Department 1108

Denver, CO 80202

Michele A. Horn

Attorney at Office of the Denver City Attorney

201 West Colfax Avenue, Department 1108

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Erica Grossman

Attorney at Holland Holland Edwards & Grossman

1437 High Street

Denver, CO 80218

Rachel Claire Kennedy

Attorney at Holland Holland Edwards & Grossman

1437 High Street

Denver, CO 80218

Anna E. Holland-Edwards

Attorney at Holland Holland Edwards & Grossman

1437 High Street

Denver, CO 80218

John Robert Holland

Attorney at Holland Holland Edwards & Grossman

1437 High Street

Denver, CO 80218

Dan Weiss

Attorney at Holland Holland Edwards & Grossman

1437 High Street

Denver, CO 80218

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10706414] Response filed by City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev to Plaintiff-Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Served on 12/31/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1461] MAH [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:15 PM]

Open Document

[10704077] Docketing statement filed by City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. Served on 12/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1461] MAH [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:47 PM]

Open Document

[10703075] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - briefing on the merits is tolled pending further order of this court. Appellants' response to motion to dismiss case due 12/31/2019 for City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. Served on 12/17/2019. [19-1461] [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:05 AM]

Open Document #7

Ex. 6 - Order Granting Motion to Stay

Open Document #6

Ex. 5 - Motion for Emergency Stay

Open Document #5

Ex. 4 - Motion to Certify as Frivolous

Open Document #4

Ex. 3 - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

Ex. 2 - MTD Order

Open Document #2

Ex. 1 - MSJ Order

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10702881] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Erica Grossman for Gregory Heard. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1461] [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:28 PM]

Open Document

[10702808] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Michele A. Horn and Mrs. Melanie Lewis for City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1461] [Entered: 12/16/2019 01:05 PM]

Open Document

[10702800] Transcript not necessary notice filed by City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1461] --[Edited 12/16/2019 by AT to reflect transcripts were not ordered. ] MAH [Entered: 12/16/2019 01:00 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10708986] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 01/16/2020 at 2:00 pm (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-1461] [Entered: 01/10/2020 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10706597] Order filed by Clerk of the Court [ # 10706414-2 ] referring Appellee's motion to dismiss case and Appellants' response [ # 10702917-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time), Appellants' brief and appendix due on 02/11/2020 for City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. Served on 01/02/2020. [19-1461] [Entered: 01/02/2020 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10706414] Response filed by City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev to Plaintiff-Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Served on 12/31/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1461] MAH [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10704077] Docketing statement filed by City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. Served on 12/19/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1461] MAH [Entered: 12/19/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703075] Order filed by Clerk of the Court - briefing on the merits is tolled pending further order of this court. Appellants' response to motion to dismiss case due 12/31/2019 for City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. Served on 12/17/2019. [19-1461] [Entered: 12/17/2019 08:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702961] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/16/2019. Appellants' brief and appendix due on 01/27/2020 for City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. [text only entry - no document attached] [19-1461] [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702917] Motion filed by Appellee Gregory Heard to dismiss case. Served on: 12/16/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1461] EG [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702881] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Erica Grossman for Gregory Heard. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1461] [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702874] Entry of appearance submitted by Erica Tick Grossman for Appellee Gregory Heard for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 12/16/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1461] EG [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702824] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/23/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1461] [Entered: 12/16/2019 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702808] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Michele A. Horn and Mrs. Melanie Lewis for City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1461] [Entered: 12/16/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702800] Transcript not necessary notice filed by City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1461] --[Edited 12/16/2019 by AT to reflect transcripts were not ordered. ] MAH [Entered: 12/16/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702797] Entry of appearance submitted by Michele A. Horn and Melanie Lewis for Appellants City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1461]--[Edited 12/16/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 12/16/2019] MAH [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10700300] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/05/2019. Docketing statement due 12/19/2019 for City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. Transcript order form due 12/19/2019 for City and County of Denver and Greg Dulayev. Notice of appearance due on 12/19/2019 for City and County of Denver, Greg Dulayev and Gregory Heard [19-1461] [Entered: 12/05/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.