This case was last updated from PACER on 06/23/2020 at 06:09:09 (UTC).

Hayley Tice v. Amazon.com, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 Hayley Tice filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55432

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

A2Z DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.

AMAZON.COM, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

HAYLEY CHARMAINE TICE, individually and on behalf of a class of similarly situated individuals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Armen Nercess Nercessian

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Molly Melcher

Attorney at Uber Technologies Inc.

1455 Market Street, 4Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

Tyler Griffin Newby

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Laurence F. Pulgram Esquire

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Adam Gahtan

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

902 Broadway, Suite 14

New York, NY 10010

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Adam J. Levitt Esquire

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

Ten North Dearborn Street, Sixth Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Rebecca A. Peterson Esquire

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.

100 Washington Avenue S., Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Amy E. Keller

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

Ten North Dearborn Street, Sixth Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Robert K. Shelquist Esquire

Attorney at LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN & HOLSTEIN P.L.L.P

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 11 ]) to withdraw the motion to maintain documents under seal at Docket Entry No. [6] is granted without prejudice to the filing of a renewed motion to seal with the appellants opening brief. The Clerk shall strike the motion at Docket Entry No. [6] and maintain the stricken filing under seal. (Pro Mo) [11709640] (WL) [Entered: 06/03/2020 11:46 AM]

#11

(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellants a2z Development Center, Inc. and AMZN Motion for miscellaneous relief [Appellants' Motion to Withdraw Appellants' Motion to Maintain Under Seal]. Date of service: 05/26/2020. [11701290] [20-55432] (Pulgram, Laurence) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:30 PM]

#10

(#10) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE from Appellee - 06/02/2020. See order for details. [11695109] (VS) [Entered: 05/19/2020 10:00 AM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE from Appellants - 06/02/2020. See order for details. [11695104] (VS) [Entered: 05/19/2020 09:58 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 05/19/2020, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11681217] (VS) [Entered: 05/05/2020 01:40 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Hayley Charmaine Tice Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/01/2020. [11678022] [20-55432] (Shelquist, Robert) [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:46 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants a2z Development Center, Inc. and AMZN Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/01/2020. [11678005] [20-55432] (Pulgram, Laurence) [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:37 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 11 ]) to withdraw the motion to maintain documents under seal at Docket Entry No. [6] is granted without prejudice to the filing of a renewed motion to seal with the appellants opening brief. The Clerk shall strike the motion at Docket Entry No. [6] and maintain the stricken filing under seal. (Pro Mo) [11709640] (WL) [Entered: 06/03/2020 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#13) Added Attorney(s) Adam Gahtan for party(s) Appellant a2z Development Center, Inc. Appellant AMZN, in case 20-55432. [11704599] (RR) [Entered: 05/29/2020 06:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adam Robert Gahtan (Fenwick & West LLP, 902 Broadway, 14th Floor, New York, New York 10010) for Appellants a2z Development Center, Inc. and AMZN. Date of service: 05/28/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11703490] [20-55432] (Gahtan, Adam) [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellants a2z Development Center, Inc. and AMZN Motion for miscellaneous relief [Appellants' Motion to Withdraw Appellants' Motion to Maintain Under Seal]. Date of service: 05/26/2020. [11701290] [20-55432] (Pulgram, Laurence) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE from Appellee - 06/02/2020. See order for details. [11695109] (VS) [Entered: 05/19/2020 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE from Appellants - 06/02/2020. See order for details. [11695104] (VS) [Entered: 05/19/2020 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#8) Streamlined request [7] by Appellants AMZN and a2z Development Center, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and a2z Development Center, Inc. opening brief due 07/16/2020. Appellee Hayley Charmaine Tice answering brief due 08/17/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11693774] (BG) [Entered: 05/18/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants a2z Development Center, Inc. and AMZN. New requested due date is 07/16/2020. [11693732] [20-55432] (Pulgram, Laurence) [Entered: 05/18/2020 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#6) STRICKEN PER ORDER [ # 14 ]. Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellants a2z Development Center, Inc. and AMZN motion to maintain document under seal. Date of service: 05/15/2020. [11692228] [20-55432] (Pulgram, Laurence) [Entered: 05/15/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 05/19/2020, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11681217] (VS) [Entered: 05/05/2020 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Hayley Charmaine Tice Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/01/2020. [11678022] [20-55432] (Shelquist, Robert) [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/01/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11678017]. [20-55432] (AD) [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants a2z Development Center, Inc. and AMZN Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/01/2020. [11678005] [20-55432] (Pulgram, Laurence) [Entered: 05/01/2020 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and a2z Development Center, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/01/2020. Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and a2z Development Center, Inc. opening brief due 06/16/2020. Appellee Hayley Charmaine Tice answering brief due 07/16/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11670666] (JBS) [Entered: 04/24/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A2Z Development Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy E Keller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert K. Shelquist