This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/12/2022 at 11:14:36 (UTC).

Hayley Holland, et al v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Hayley Holland filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-15333

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

HAYLEY HOLLAND, parent on behalf of D.M.W.

ALYAN WATT, parent on behalf of D.M.W.

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

BANNER HEALTH, an Arizona corporation, DBA Banner Casa Grande Medical Center

CHARLOTTE SONO-PETTY, R.M., an Arizona resident

JUDY QUICK, R.N., an Arizona resident

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David Lawrence Abney Esquire

Attorney at Ahwatukee Legal Office, P.C.

P.O. Box 50351

Phoenix, AZ 85076

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brock J. Heathcotte

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

40 N Central Avenue, Suite 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004

GinaMarie Slattery

Attorney at Slattery Petersen PLLC

5981 E. Grant Road, Suite 101

Tucson, AZ 85712-2363

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Hayley Holland and Alyan Watt Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/11/2022. Appellants Hayley Holland and Alyan Watt opening brief due 05/06/2022. Appellees Banner Health, Judy Quick, Charlotte Sono-Petty and United States of America answering brief due 06/06/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12386856] (RT) [Entered: 03/04/2022 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Banner Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brock Jason Heathcotte