This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/01/2021 at 05:04:03 (UTC).

Hawthorne Hangar Operations LP, et al v. Hawthorne Airport, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Hawthorne Hangar Operations LP filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Hawthorne Airport, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55542

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

HAWTHORNE HANGAR OPERATIONS, L.P., a California limited partnership

DAN WOLFE, an individual

Defendant / Appellees

ADVANCED AIR, LLC, a California limited liability company

HAWTHORNE AIRPORT, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

CITY OF HAWTHORNE, a municipal corporation

LEVI STOCKTON, an individual

DAVID WEHRLY, an individual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ernest Joseph Franceschi Esquire Jr.

4640 Admiralty Way

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kirsten Elizabeth Stockton

3713 Highland Avenue, Suite 2

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Elizabeth L. Bradley

Attorney at Rosen Saba, LLP

9350 Wilshire Boulevardsuite 250

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Ryan D. Saba

Attorney at Rosen Saba LLP

9350 Wilshire Boulevardsuite 250

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Kirsten Stockton

Attorney at Yoffe and Cooper, LLP

3713 Highland Avenuesuite 2

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Stephen Daifun Lee

Attorney at Richards, Watson & Gershon

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3101

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#2

#4

#5

#14

#15

#16

#17

#18

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion [ # 17 ] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.; Appellants Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P. and Dan Wolfe opening brief due 10/12/2021. Appellees Advanced Air, LLC, City of Hawthorne, Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Levi Stockton and David Wehrly answering brief due 11/12/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12188926] (GS) [Entered: 08/02/2021 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed (ECF) Appellant Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P. Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 10/12/2021. Date of service: 07/30/2021. [12188185] [21-55542] (Franceschi, Ernest) [Entered: 07/30/2021 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12158793] (BLS) [Entered: 06/30/2021 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record reflects that the district court has denied the post-judgment motion and that an amended notice of appeal has been filed to include the order denying the post-judgment motion. Accordingly, the notice of appeal is so amended, and briefing may proceed. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due August 11, 2021. The answering briefs are due September 10, 2021. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12157889] (OC) [Entered: 06/29/2021 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12155769] (RL) [Entered: 06/28/2021 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#13) Added Attorney(s) Ryan D. Saba for party(s) Appellee Hawthorne Airport, LLC, in case 21-55542. [12153209] (JFF) [Entered: 06/24/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ryan Donald Saba (Rosen Saba, LLP, 9350 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 250, Beverly Hills, CA 90212) for Appellee Hawthorne Airport, LLC. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12153036] [21-55542] (Saba, Ryan) [Entered: 06/24/2021 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#11) Added Attorney(s) Ryan D. Saba for party(s) Appellee Advanced Air, LLC Appellee David Wehrly Appellee Levi Stockton, in case 21-55542. [12153016] (JFF) [Entered: 06/24/2021 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Elizabeth L. Bradley for party(s) Appellee Hawthorne Airport, LLC Appellee Advanced Air, LLC Appellee David Wehrly Appellee Levi Stockton, in case 21-55542. [12153010] (JFF) [Entered: 06/24/2021 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ryan Donald Saba (Rosen Saba, LLP 9350 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 250, Beverly Hills, CA 90212) for Appellees Advanced Air, LLC, Levi Stockton, David Wehrly and Appellant Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P.. Date of service: 06/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12152871] [21-55542] (Saba, Ryan) [Entered: 06/24/2021 08:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Elizabeth L. Bradley (Rosen Saba, LLP, 9350 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 250, Beverly Hills, CA 90212) for Appellees Advanced Air, LLC, Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Levi Stockton and David Wehrly. Date of service: 06/23/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12152749] [21-55542] (Bradley, Elizabeth) [Entered: 06/23/2021 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance (ECF Filing) [6] is rejected. Filer is not permitted to file on behalf of another attorney. Each attorney must file their own notice of appearance. [12152703] (JFF) [Entered: 06/23/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Elizabeth L. Bradley (Rosen Saba, LLP, 9350 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 250, Beverly Hills, CA 90212) for Appellees Advanced Air, LLC, Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Levi Stockton and David Wehrly. Date of service: 06/23/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12152655] [21-55542] (Saba, Ryan) [Entered: 06/23/2021 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 06/22/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12136823] (BLS) [Entered: 06/08/2021 07:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): The courts records reflect that appellants timely filed a motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), which is still pending. The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, appellate proceedings other than mediation shall be held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994); Tripati v. Henman, 845 F.2d 205, 206 (9th Cir. 1988). Within 7 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellants shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whether appellants intend to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellants must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [12129861] (TSP) [Entered: 06/01/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/27/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12127622]. [21-55542] (AD) [Entered: 05/27/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P. and Dan Wolfe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/27/2021. [12127579] [21-55542] (Franceschi, Ernest) [Entered: 05/27/2021 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P. and Dan Wolfe Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/02/2021. Appellants Hawthorne Hangar Operations, L.P. and Dan Wolfe opening brief due 07/26/2021. Appellees Advanced Air, LLC, City of Hawthorne, Hawthorne Airport, LLC, Levi Stockton and David Wehrly answering brief due 08/25/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12125250] (JBS) [Entered: 05/26/2021 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Air, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hawthorne Airport, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan D Saba